Global Patent Index - EP 0457153 B1

EP 0457153 B1 2002-09-18 - Method for processing a silver halide photographic material

Title (en)

Method for processing a silver halide photographic material

Title (de)

Verarbeitungsverfahren für photographische Silberhalogenidmaterialien

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement d'un matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent

Publication

EP 0457153 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91107343 A

Priority

JP 11804490 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0457153A1] A silver halide photographic material, which is excellent in sharpness and drying property and enables rapid processing within 45 seconds or less, having on a support at least one hydrophilic colloid layer containing a solid dye dispersed therein and at least one silver halide emulsion layer provided thereon, wherein the amount of all the hydrophilic colloids present on each side of the photographic material is 2.5 g/m<2> or less, and all the hydrophilic colloid layers present are hardened to a degree sufficient to attain a swelling rate of less than 200%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/83; G03C 1/005; G03C 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/047 (2006.01); G03C 1/30 (2006.01); G03C 1/825 (2006.01); G03C 1/83 (2006.01); G03C 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/832 (2013.01); G03C 1/005 (2013.01); G03C 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0457153 A1 19911121; EP 0457153 B1 20020918; DE 69133110 D1 20021024; DE 69133110 T2 20030116; JP 2835638 B2 19981214; JP H0414039 A 19920120

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090506

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080507

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69133110 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-04-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PROCESSING A SILVER HALIDE PHOTOGRAPHIC MATERIAL

1992-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19921113

1992-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920309

1991-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL