Global Patent Index - EP 0458599 B2

EP 0458599 B2 2000-11-29 - Fabric treatment composition

Title (en)

Fabric treatment composition

Title (de)

Textilbehandlungsmittel

Title (fr)

Composition de traitement des tissus

Publication

EP 0458599 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 91304603 A

Priority

GB 9011785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0458599A2] A fabric treatment composition comprising an aqueous base, one or more, fabric-softening materials and an emulsion component, said composition having a structure of lamellar droplets of the fabric-softening material in combination with an emulsion, said composition also comprising a deflocculating polymer comprising a hydrophilic backbone and one or more hydrophobic side chains. The deflocculating polymer allows the incorporation of greater amounts of softening materials and/or emulsion components that would otherwise be compatible with the need for a stable, easily dispersible product of acceptable viscosity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/46 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 13/47 (2006.01); D06M 13/473 (2006.01); D06M 15/267 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/04 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 3/225 (2013.01); C11D 3/227 (2013.01); C11D 3/228 (2013.01); C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 3/3773 (2013.01); C11D 17/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

EP 0095580 A2 19831207 - AKZO GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0458599 A2 19911127; EP 0458599 A3 19920708; EP 0458599 B1 19970129; EP 0458599 B2 20001129; AU 636753 B2 19930506; AU 7725891 A 19911128; BR 9102126 A 19911224; CA 2042979 A1 19911126; CA 2042979 C 20001031; DE 69124420 D1 19970313; DE 69124420 T2 19970515; DE 69124420 T3 20010222; ES 2097793 T3 19970416; ES 2097793 T5 20010216; GB 9011785 D0 19900718; JP 2818632 B2 19981030; JP H04228680 A 19920818; KR 940010047 B1 19941021; ZA 9103958 B 19930127

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110522

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110522

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110520

2011-06-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20110520

2011-05-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69124420

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-01-05 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-12-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-12-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-11-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-04-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-04-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000417

- Year of fee payment: 10

1998-03-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

1998-03-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

1998-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

1997-12-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

- Effective date: 19970927

1997-12-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 19971029

1997-11-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

- Effective date: 19970927

1997-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2097793 T3

1997-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-03-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: 0414;05TOFJACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1997-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69124420 19970313

1997-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

1997-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-01-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970129

1995-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950714

1992-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19921001

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

1992-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1991-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE