Global patent index - EP 0459602 B2

EP 0459602 B2 2000-02-09 - Mass spectrometric high-frequency quadrupole cage with superposed multipole fields

Title (en)

Mass spectrometric high-frequency quadrupole cage with superposed multipole fields

Title (de)

Massenspektrometrischer Hochfrequenz-Quadrupol-Käfig mit überlagerten Multipolfeldern

Title (fr)

Cage quadrupolaire haute fréquence pour spectrométrie de masse avec champs multipolaires superposés

Publication

EP 0459602 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91250128 A

Priority

DE 4017264 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0459602A2] An ion cage mass spectrometer, also known as a quistor or ion trap, having an annular electrode and two end-cap electrodes, voltage supplies for generating an ion-storing RF quadrupole field, means for generating ions of the substances which are to be investigated by mass-spectrometric means inside or outside the ion cage, if appropriate, means for introducing the ions into the ion cage, means for detecting those ions which emerge from the ion cage, characterised in that the exact quadrupole potential… Pq = (A2/4z0<2>) * (r<2>-2z<2>) * [U - Vcos(Wt)]… has superposed on it, by special shaping of the electrodes, exactly or approximately, a six-pole potential… Ps = (A3/4z0<3>) * (3r<2>z-2z<3>) * [U - Vcos(Wt)],… or an eight-pole potential… P0 = (A4/4z0<4>) * (r<4> + 8z<4>/3-8r<2>z<2>) * [U - Vcos(Wt)],… or a linear combination of the two, where … …  r = distance from the z-axis, …  z = distance from the plane z = 0, …  z0 = distance of an end cap from the centre z = 0, …  A2 = intensity of the quadrupole field, …  A3 = intensity of the six-pole field, …  A4 = intensity of the eight-pole field, …  U = value of the DC voltage …  V = peak value of the AC voltage, …   omega = angular frequency of the AC voltage, …  t = time. … …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/42; H01J 49/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/424 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0459602 A2 19911204; EP 0459602 A3 19920701; EP 0459602 B1 19960313; EP 0459602 B2 20000209; DE 4017264 A1 19911219; DE 4017264 C2 19921203; US 5170054 A 19921208

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110508

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110507

2011-06-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20110507

2011-05-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59107529

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRUKER DALTONIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100505

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090504

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-07-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2000-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-03-24 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-03-01 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BRUKER DALTONIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

1998-12-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BRUKER DALTONIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

1997-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: FINNIGAN CORPORATION

1997-02-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FINNIGAN CORPORATION

- Effective date: 19961212

1996-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59107529

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-04-18

1996-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19960313

1996-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1995-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950504

1993-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19921207

1992-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1991-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL