Global Patent Index - EP 0460238 B1

EP 0460238 B1 2000-05-03 - INSULATED WIRE

Title (en)

INSULATED WIRE

Title (de)

ISOLIERTER DRAHT

Title (fr)

CABLE ISOLE

Publication

EP 0460238 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91901438 A

Priority

  • JP 34348989 A
  • JP 9001700 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0460238A1] An insulated wire provided with a conductor, a first insulating metal oxide layer formed around the conductor, and a second insulating metal oxide layer formed around the first layer and including ceramic grains. The insulating metal oxide layers can be formed by converting a precursor of the metal oxide into a ceramic by a method such as a sol-gel method or a thermal decomposition method. As the ceramic grains to be mixed, microplate-like ones are pref.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 3/10; B32B 15/04; C23C 28/00; H01B 7/02; H01B 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/02 (2006.01); H01B 3/10 (2006.01); H01B 7/29 (2006.01); H01B 7/295 (2006.01); H01B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/295 (2013.01); H01B 3/105 (2013.01); H01B 7/292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0460238 A1 19911211; EP 0460238 A4 19921125; EP 0460238 B1 20000503; CA 2050339 A1 19910628; CA 2050339 C 19971202; DE 69033532 D1 20000608; JP H03201311 A 19910903; WO 9110238 A1 19910711

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051226

2001-10-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-09-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001226

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001226

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033532 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01B 3/10 A, 7H 01B 7/42 B, 7H 01B 7/02 B, 7C 23C 28/00 B, 7B 32B 15/04 B

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970416

1992-11-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1992-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1991-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910823

1991-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT