Global Patent Index - EP 0460309 B2

EP 0460309 B2 2000-07-05 - Modified dispersant compositions

Title (en)

Modified dispersant compositions

Title (de)

Modifizierte Lösungsmittelzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions dispersantes modifiées

Publication

EP 0460309 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 90306128 A

Priority

EP 90306128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0460309A1] An oil soluble dispersant composition formed by reacting a basic nitrogen-containing ashless dispersant (i) with at least one dibasic acylating agent and (ii) with at least one boron compound, said reactions (i) and (ii) being conducted concurrently or sequentially in any order such that the initial ashless dispersant is chemically modified via acylation in (i) and by boronation in (ii).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 133/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 159/12 (2006.01); C10L 1/2383 (2006.01); C10M 125/26 (2006.01); C10M 129/34 (2006.01); C10M 129/36 (2006.01); C10M 133/16 (2006.01); C10M 133/52 (2006.01); C10M 133/56 (2006.01); C10M 133/58 (2006.01); C10M 139/00 (2006.01); C10M 159/16 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 60/14 (2006.01); C10N 70/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10M 133/52 (2013.01); C10M 133/56 (2013.01); C10M 159/16 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0460309 A1 19911211; EP 0460309 B1 19950823; EP 0460309 B2 20000705; AU 645809 B2 19940127; AU 7813491 A 19911212; CA 2043998 A1 19911207; CA 2043998 C 20030812; DE 69021872 D1 19950928; DE 69021872 T2 19960118; DE 69021872 T3 20030213; JP 2966586 B2 19991025; JP H04227995 A 19920818; ZA 9104157 B 19930224

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070606

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-03-15 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8570

2000-09-22 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-07-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000517

- Year of fee payment: 11

1996-07-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

- Effective date: 19960517

1996-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

1995-11-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19951123

1995-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1995-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69021872

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-09-28

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1995-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19950823

1995-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950823

1995-08-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950823

1992-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19920504

1992-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19911115

1991-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE