Global Patent Index - EP 0460367 B2

EP 0460367 B2 2001-03-14 - Hand grip for carrying an article

Title (en)

Hand grip for carrying an article

Title (de)

Handgriff zum Tragen eines Gegenstandes

Title (fr)

Poignée pour porter un objet

Publication

EP 0460367 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91104751 A

Priority

DE 4017907 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0460367A2] A handgrip (2) for carrying an article, in particular a grip moulded onto a plastic box, has a plurality of lamellar, vertically extending webs (6) which project perpendicularly from a vertically extending outer wall (1) and extend between two wall supports (4, 5) which start from this outer wall and project horizontally inwards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/38; B65D 25/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/22 (2006.01); B65D 25/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/22 (2013.01); B65D 25/30 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0460367 A2 19911211; EP 0460367 A3 19921202; EP 0460367 B1 19960807; EP 0460367 B2 20010314; AT 141086 T 19960815; DE 4017907 A1 19911205

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110326

2011-03-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59108058

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-03-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-12 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-03-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1998-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

1997-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-02-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHOELLER-PLAST SA

- Effective date: 19961223

1996-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WERNER BRUDERER PATENTANWALT

1996-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59108058 19960912

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1996-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 141086 T 19960815

1995-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950711

1993-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930514

1992-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1991-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI