Global Patent Index - EP 0460457 B2

EP 0460457 B2 2000-03-01 - Machine vice

Title (en)

Machine vice

Title (de)

Maschinenschraubstock

Title (fr)

Etau de machines

Publication

EP 0460457 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91108333 A

Priority

  • DE 4018194 A
  • DE 4112418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0460457A2] The machine vice has a basic body (1) with a fixed gripping jaw (2) and a movable gripping jaw (3) which can be driven by means of a hollow screw spindle (7). Acting on this screw spindle (7) is a power amplifier (8) which is arranged below the fixed gripping jaw (8) and is supported on an abutment (9, 10) arranged between the power amplifier (8) and the end (7a) of the screw spindle (7). A push rod (18) can be displaced in the screw spindle (7). A drive device (27) acts on one end of the push rod (18) and its other end presses against the power amplifier (8). The secondary member (17) of the same is axially connected in a tension-proof but rotatable manner to the end (7a) of the screw spindle (7) via a tension connection (21, 23). The drive device (27) common to the screw spindle (7) and the power amplifier (8) is located beneath the movable gripping jaw (3) in its fully open position. The movable gripping jaw can be split up into a top and bottom part. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 1/10; B23Q 3/02; B25B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/06 (2006.01); B25B 1/10 (2006.01); B25B 1/14 (2006.01); B25B 1/18 (2006.01); B25B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/18 (2013.01); B25B 1/106 (2013.01); B25B 1/2473 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0460457 A2 19911211; EP 0460457 A3 19920401; EP 0460457 B1 19950315; EP 0460457 B2 20000301; DE 4112418 A1 19921022; ES 2073065 T3 19950801; ES 2073065 T5 20000716; JP 3286791 B2 20020527; JP H06344268 A 19941220; US 5251887 A 19931012

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090525

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-06-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-07-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-07-13 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-05-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-03-01 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1996-01-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROEHM GMBH

- Effective date: 19951111

1995-09-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19950315

1995-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2073065 T3

1995-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

1995-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59104937 19950420

1995-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1995-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Effective date: 19950315

1993-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930728

1992-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920310

1992-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1991-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI