EP 0464107 A4 19920603 - CONTROLLED RELEASE OF DESIRED PRODUCT THROUGH THE CONTROLLED REACTION OF PRECURSOR
Title (en)
CONTROLLED RELEASE OF DESIRED PRODUCT THROUGH THE CONTROLLED REACTION OF PRECURSOR
Publication
Application
Priority
US 32679189 A 19890321
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO9011248A1] A method of controlled release of a gas (44) comprising the controlled introduction of a specific reacting or catalyzing solution (36) into contact with a precursor compound (32).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
A01K 63/04 (2006.01); A62B 21/00 (2006.01); B01J 7/02 (2006.01); C01B 13/02 (2006.01); C01B 32/50 (2017.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A01K 63/042 (2013.01); A62B 21/00 (2013.01); B01J 7/02 (2013.01); C01B 13/0211 (2013.01); C01B 32/50 (2017.07)
Citation (search report)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 080 (C-409)11 March 1987 & JP-A-61 236 602 ( MICHIMASA OGURI ) 21 October 1986
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 003, no. 116 (M-074)27 September 1979 & JP-A-54 093 215 ( TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD. ) 24 July 1979
- [A] WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 86-005044/01 & JP-A-58 033 590 (IKEDA A) 26 February 1983
- See references of WO 9011248A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9011248 A1 19901004; AU 5345190 A 19901022; CA 2048687 A1 19900922; EP 0464107 A1 19920108; EP 0464107 A4 19920603; JP H04504102 A 19920723
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9001523 W 19900321; AU 5345190 A 19900321; CA 2048687 A 19900321; EP 90905330 A 19900321; JP 50527890 A 19900321