Global patent index - EP 0466754 B2

EP 0466754 B2 2000-01-19 - INSULATING PRODUCT OF MINERAL FIBRE WOOL, INTENDED IN PARTICULAR FOR HEAT INSULATION OF PIPES, AND METHOD FOR MAKING THIS PRODUCT

Title (en)

INSULATING PRODUCT OF MINERAL FIBRE WOOL, INTENDED IN PARTICULAR FOR HEAT INSULATION OF PIPES, AND METHOD FOR MAKING THIS PRODUCT

Title (de)

DÄMMSTOFF AUS MINERALWOLLE FÜR DIE RÖHRENWÄRMEDÄMMUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PRODUIT ISOLANT EN LAINE DE FIBRE MINERALE, DESTINE EN PARTICULIER A L'ISOLATION THERMIQUE DE CONDUITES ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN TEL PRODUIT

Publication

EP 0466754 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 90905535 A

Priority

  • FI 9000093 W
  • FI 891659 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9012139A1] The invention relates to a heat insulation product of mineral fibre wool and to a method of producing this. The curable binding agent of the product is an aqueous suspension containing water glass and slag. The slag reacts hydraulically with the alkalis of the water glass, yielding water resistant bonds. During the preparation of the product, the suspension of water glass and slag is agitated before being applied onto the product. The curing of the binding agent can be carried out at once or later, at the prevailing outer temperature or at a raised temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/64; F16L 59/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 14/00 (2006.01); B28B 1/52 (2006.01); C04B 28/26 (2006.01); D04H 1/4209 (2012.01); D04H 1/64 (2012.01); D04H 1/645 (2012.01); F16L 59/14 (2006.01); C04B 111/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/645 (2013.01); D04H 1/4209 (2013.01); D04H 1/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9012139 A1 19901018; AT 124734 T 19950715; CA 2051405 A1 19901007; DE 69020729 D1 19950810; DE 69020729 T2 19951102; EP 0466754 A1 19920122; EP 0466754 B1 19950705; EP 0466754 B2 20000119; FI 891659 A0 19890406; FI 891659 A 19901007; JP H04506236 A 19921029; RU 2074147 C1 19970227; YU 67090 A 19910831

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030405

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030406

2003-04-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030405

2002-04-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020412

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-04-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020410

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-03-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020321

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-09-21 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8570

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2000-01-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-12-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: PAROC GROUP OY AB

1996-05-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GRUENZWEIG + HARTMANN AG

- Effective date: 19960403

1996-05-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

- Effective date: 19960403

1996-05-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

- Effective date: 19960403

1996-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19960430

1996-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

1995-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

1995-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

1995-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69020729

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 19950810

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1995-07-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 124734

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 19950715

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1994-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940318

1992-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19911002

1992-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE