Global Patent Index - EP 0468973 B2

EP 0468973 B2 2001-05-09 - MONITOR CONTROL CIRCUIT

Title (en)

MONITOR CONTROL CIRCUIT

Title (de)

MONITORSTEUERSCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE MONITEUR

Publication

EP 0468973 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 90904821 A

Priority

  • DE 3915562 A
  • EP 9000466 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE3915562C1] A monitor control circuit for driving a monitor which operates at a second pixel frequency on the basis of a digital image signal with a first pixel frequency has a first storage device (3) into which the image signal can be read with a frequency dependent on the first pixel frequency by means of a first control device, and a video storage device in effective connection with the output of the first storage device (3). To ensure constant updating of the image signal to be displayed, the first storage device is a first in-first out storage device (3), and a second storage device (6) connected to the video storage device (4) and to the first in-first out storage device (3) can read data words from the first in-first out storage device (3) and can write them into the video storage device (4) in such a manner that the reading of the data words from the first in-first out storage device (3) is interrupted when data words are being read from the video storage device (4). As a result, the number of data words stored in the first in-first out device (3) which can be re-stored in the video storage device (4) can vary.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 1/16 (2006.01); G09G 5/12 (2006.01); G09G 5/18 (2006.01); G09G 5/393 (2006.01); G09G 5/395 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/395 (2013.01); G09G 5/393 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9013886 A2 19901115; WO 9013886 A3 19901227; AT 137352 T 19960515; AT 85858 T 19930315; DE 3915562 C1 19901031; DE 59000902 D1 19930325; DE 59010304 D1 19960530; DK 0468973 T3 19930510; DK 0468973 T4 20010730; DK 0500147 T3 19960513; DK 0500147 T4 20011008; EP 0468973 A1 19920205; EP 0468973 B1 19930217; EP 0468973 B2 20010509; EP 0500147 A2 19920826; EP 0500147 A3 19921014; EP 0500147 B1 19960424; EP 0500147 B2 20010822; ES 2038054 T3 19930701; ES 2038054 T5 20010916; ES 2089283 T3 19961001; ES 2089283 T5 20020116; JP 2971132 B2 19991102; JP H04507147 A 19921210; KR 960003396 B1 19960309; US 5329290 A 19940712

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100321

2011-04-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-02-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100320

2010-04-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20100320

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090306

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030322

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SPEA SOFTWARE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030322

2003-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030322

2003-03-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SPEA SOFTWARE AG TRANSFER- ATI INTERNATIONAL SRL

2002-04-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020405

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-04-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-03-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-03-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-03-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-07-30 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2001-07-04 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-07-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-06-15 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-05-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-09 [DX] MISCELLANEOUS: (DELETED)

2001-05-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2001-03-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010328

- Year of fee payment: 12

1997-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

1997-02-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SPEA SOFTWARE GMBH

1996-10-31 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

1996-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SPEA SOFTWARE GMBH

1996-08-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SPEA SOFTWARE GMBH

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1994-01-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Effective date: 19931117

1993-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2038054 T3

1993-05-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1993-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1993-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19930301

1993-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19930331

1993-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59000902 19930325

1993-03-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

1993-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1993-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 85858 T 19930315

1993-02-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 92107715.2 EINGEREICHT AM 21/03/90.

1992-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920810

1992-06-12 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1992-04-22 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1992-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910321

1992-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE