Global Patent Index - EP 0469268 B2

EP 0469268 B2 2000-05-31 - Connection between the outlet of a metallurgical vessel and a protective tube or immersion nozzle

Title (en)

Connection between the outlet of a metallurgical vessel and a protective tube or immersion nozzle

Title (de)

Verbindung zwischen dem Auslauf eines metallurgischen Gefässes und einem Schutzrohr oder Eintauchausguss

Title (fr)

Assemblage entre l'écoulement d'un récipient métallurgique et d'un tube de protection ou d'une busette de coulée à immersion

Publication

EP 0469268 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91109446 A

Priority

DE 4024520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0469268A2] The intention is, in a connection between the outlet (2) of a metallurgical vessel and an adjoining protective tube or immersion nozzle (3), to simplify sealing and monitor leak-tightness. Compressible sealing rings (5, 6) are arranged above and below an annular space (7) which is supplied with inert gas. A gauge (11) monitors the gas pressure prevailing in the annular space (7). …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10; B22D 41/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 41/50 (2006.01); B22D 41/58 (2006.01); F27D 3/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/502 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0469268 A2 19920205; EP 0469268 A3 19921209; EP 0469268 B1 19950426; EP 0469268 B2 20000531; AT 121651 T 19950515; BR 9103303 A 19920526; CA 2047021 A1 19920203; CA 2047021 C 20011002; CN 1025826 C 19940907; CN 1058555 A 19920212; DE 4024520 A1 19920206; DE 4024520 C2 19920910; ES 2072482 T3 19950716; ES 2072482 T5 20001016; FI 913570 A0 19910725; FI 913570 A 19920203; FI 94846 B 19950731; FI 94846 C 19951110; JP 2961458 B2 19991012; JP H0584566 A 19930406; KR 970001554 B1 19970211; RU 2013732 C1 19940530; US 5173242 A 19921222; ZA 9104390 B 19920429

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100608

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100608

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070608

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070608

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIDIER-WERKE A.G.

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060609

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-06-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-06-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060609

2006-06-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060609

2005-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-10-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-11 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-06-21 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-05-31 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

1999-03-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 19960118

1997-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

1997-02-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 19960118

1996-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

1996-03-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Effective date: 19960118

1996-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1995-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2072482 T3

1995-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19950605

1995-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1995-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19950630

1995-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19950630

1995-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59105298 19950601

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1995-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 121651 T 19950515

1994-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940620

1993-05-12 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1992-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1992-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910625

1992-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE