Global Patent Index - EP 0472513 B2

EP 0472513 B2 2001-12-05 - Procedure and device in a cylinder drying section of a paper machine

Title (en)

Procedure and device in a cylinder drying section of a paper machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung in einem Papiermaschinen-Zylindertrockner

Title (fr)

Procédure et disposition dans une section de séchoir à tambours de machine à papier

Publication

EP 0472513 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91890159 A

Priority

AT 171890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0472513A1] A process in a paper machine cylinder dryer, in which the web is guided along the upper drying cylinders (1, 1') using an upper drying wire (4) and along the lower drying cylinders (2, 2') using a lower drying wire (4'), the drying wires (4, 4') being guided by the surface of the drying cylinders (1, 1'; 2, 2') and by wire-guide rollers (5, 5') arranged in the interspaces thereof in such a way that the web (3) has direct drying contact with the surface of the upper drying cylinders (1, 1') as a result of the upper drying wire (4) being pressed against the row of the upper drying cylinders (1, 1') and is correspondingly pressed by the lower drying wire (4') against the surface of the lower drying cylinders (2, 2'), and the web (3) being passed in free tension from one to the other row of drying cylinders (1, 1'; 2, 2') over a defined section, is characterised in that simultaneously blowing through the wire (4, 4') in the region of the paper web (3) takes place in the part running up onto the drying cylinder (1, 1'; 2, 2') and extraction takes place from the gusset between the drying wire (4, 4') running off and the wire-guide roller (5, 5'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/18; F26B 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/042 (2013.01); F26B 13/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0472513 A1 19920226; EP 0472513 B1 19950927; EP 0472513 B2 20011205; AT 394740 B 19920610; AT A171890 A 19911115; DE 59106580 D1 19951102

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-12-21 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-12-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

1997-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1996-08-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VALMET CORPORATION

- Effective date: 19960626

1996-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19960731

1996-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19960731

1996-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1996-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59106580 19951102

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

1995-09-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19950927

1995-09-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Effective date: 19950927

1995-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950927

1995-09-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950927

1994-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940425

1992-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920803

1992-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL