Global Patent Index - EP 0476718 B2

EP 0476718 B2 2001-05-09 - Wire-stitching device for printed products with several parts

Title (en)

Wire-stitching device for printed products with several parts

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Drahtheften von mehrteiligen Druckereierzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour piquer des produits d'imprimerie à plusieurs parties

Publication

EP 0476718 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91119133 A

Priority

  • CH 196489 A
  • EP 90108961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0399317A1] The signature assembling machine has saddle-shaped supports (14), travelling round a closed track and extending at right angles to the direction of rotation (U), over which the signatures (20) are placed at spaced feed stations. One station is followed by another one with stapling heads (28) travelling in synchronism with the supports during the stapling operation on the signatures straddling the holders. The staples are formed from straight wire lengths (28), with teh signatures discharged after stapling. The stapling heads travel round a closed track (26) and past a dispenser (30) for the wire lengths and at the same speed as the supports. A part (D) of this track coincides with that for the supports.

[origin: EP0399317A1] The closed-loop movement path (26) for the stitching heads (28) extends around the gathering drum (10). One stitching head (28) is assigned to each rest (14). Said stitching heads circulate synchronously around the axis of rotation (12). When passing by the wire portion dispenser (30), each stitching head (28) receives in each case one wire portion (38), from which a staple is formed in the region (A). In the region (B), the staple is brought onto the side of the stitching heads (28) facing the rests (14). In the region (C), the stitching heads (28) are lowered onto the printed sheets (20) placed on the rests (14) and stitched together. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42B 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42B 4/00 (2006.01); B42B 4/02 (2006.01); B42C 1/12 (2006.01); B65H 5/32 (2006.01); B65H 31/28 (2006.01); B65H 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 4/00 (2013.01); B42B 4/02 (2013.01); B42C 1/12 (2013.01); B65H 5/32 (2013.01); B65H 2301/436 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4361 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44795 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0399317 A1 19901128; EP 0399317 B1 19931215; AT 126130 T 19950815; AU 5590790 A 19901129; AU 622556 B2 19920409; CA 2017443 A1 19901125; CA 2017443 C 20000822; DD 294677 A5 19911010; DE 59003842 D1 19940127; DE 59004157 D1 19940217; DE 59009519 D1 19950914; EP 0476718 A1 19920325; EP 0476718 B1 19940105; EP 0476718 B2 20010509; EP 0569887 A1 19931118; EP 0569887 B1 19950809; ES 2047193 T3 19940216; ES 2076816 T3 19951101; FI 902605 A0 19900524; FI 98352 B 19970228; FI 98352 C 19970610; JP 2646191 B2 19970825; JP 2652077 B2 19970910; JP H0321497 A 19910130; JP H0752578 A 19950228; RU 2057029 C1 19960327; RU 2071919 C1 19970120

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090513

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090512

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090512

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090512

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-12 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-05-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-05-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-05-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GRAPHA-HOLDING AG

- Effective date: 19940321

1994-04-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

1994-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59004157 19940217

1994-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19940119

1994-01-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 399317

1994-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE

1992-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920824

1992-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920206

1992-03-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 399317

1992-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE