Global Patent Index - EP 0476883 B2

EP 0476883 B2 2000-12-20 - Electrical connector assembly

Title (en)

Electrical connector assembly

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckverbinderanordnung

Title (fr)

Assemblage de connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0476883 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 91308042 A

Priority

US 58636090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0476883A2] An electrical connector assembly 10 includes a receptacle member (12) and a pin header (60). The receptacle member (12) has a housing (14) including an inner body portion (22) and two opposed outer side walls 24, which together define elongate cavities (36) between inner body section (22) and respective outer side walls (24); and a plurality of first contact terminal members (40) disposed in inner body portion (22) and a plurality of second contact terminal members (46) disposed in the elongate cavities (36). The pin header (60) includes a housing member (62) having a plurality of third electrical contact terminal members (78) disposed therein and adapted to mate with the first terminal members and at least one ground bus member (92) disposed continuously along at least one side of pin header housing (62), the bus member (92) being adapted to be received in one of the respective elongate cavities (36) of receptacle member (12) and electrically engage the second terminal members (46) therein, when the receptacle member (12) and pin header (60) are mated. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/658; H01R 12/18; H01R 12/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 12/72 (2011.01); H01R 12/73 (2011.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/6873 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01); H01R 12/737 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0476883 A2 19920325; EP 0476883 A3 19921014; EP 0476883 B1 19951025; EP 0476883 B2 20001220; DE 69114094 D1 19951130; DE 69114094 T2 19960530; JP 3194603 B2 20010730; JP H04255678 A 19920910; KR 970004153 B1 19970325

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110830

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110829

2011-09-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20110829

2011-09-07 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20110830

2011-08-31 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69114094

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-09 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-03-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-12-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-12-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-12-20 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/658 A, 7H 01R 12/18 B, 7H 01R 12/20 B

2000-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG GR PA 6

2000-05-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG GR PA 6

- Effective date: 19960725

1996-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG GR PA 6

1996-09-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG GR PA 6

- Effective date: 19960725

1996-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69114094 19951130

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1995-10-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

1994-11-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19941012

1993-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930402

1993-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE WHITAKER CORPORATION

1992-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1992-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL