Global Patent Index - EP 0477461 B2

EP 0477461 B2 2001-05-16 - Nickel/hydrogen storage battery and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Nickel/hydrogen storage battery and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Nickel-Wasserstoff-Akkumulator und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Accumulateur du type nickel-hydrogène et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0477461 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 91105059 A

Priority

JP 25801590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0477461A2] A nickel/hydrogen storage battery comprises a nickel positive electrode having nickel oxide as a main active material, a negative electrode mainly composed of a hydrogen absorbing alloy capable of carrying out the electrochemical hydrogen absorbing and desorbing reaction, an alkaline electrolyte, and a separator, a zinc compound being contained in the nickel positive electrode, the negative electrode and the separator. The content of the zinc compound in terms of zinc oxide is 30-500 mg per Ah of battery capacity in the nickel positive electrode and 0.3-15 mg in the negative electrode and the separator. Thus, the expansion of the nickel positive electrode can be inhibited and the electrolyte retention of the negative electrode and the separator can be improved and the cycle life of the battery can be prolonged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 10/34; H01M 2/16; H01M 4/24; H01M 4/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 2/36 (2006.01); H01M 4/32 (2006.01); H01M 4/38 (2006.01); H01M 4/52 (2006.01); H01M 4/62 (2006.01); H01M 10/26 (2006.01); H01M 10/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 10/345 (2013.01); H01M 2/361 (2013.01); H01M 4/383 (2013.01); H01M 4/52 (2013.01); H01M 10/26 (2013.01); Y02E 60/124 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49115 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5077149 A 19911231; DE 69110599 D1 19950727; DE 69110599 T2 19960229; DE 69110599 T3 20020411; EP 0477461 A2 19920401; EP 0477461 A3 19930414; EP 0477461 B1 19950621; EP 0477461 B2 20010516; JP H04137368 A 19920512

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110327

2011-04-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20110327

2011-03-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69110599

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-24 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-05-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-05-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALCATEL ALSTHOM CIE. GEN. D'ELECTRICITE

- Effective date: 19960313

1995-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69110599 19950727

1995-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1994-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940422

1993-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930607

1993-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1992-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB