Global Patent Index - EP 0477887 B2

EP 0477887 B2 2000-09-06 - Coupling means for containers

Title (en)

Coupling means for containers

Title (de)

Kuppelstück zum Verbinden von Containern

Title (fr)

Pièce d'accouplement pour conteneurs

Publication

EP 0477887 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91116305 A

Priority

DE 4030336 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0477887A1] Coupling means (so-called twist locks) are known for connecting containers (20, 21) on board ships, which coupling means require the containers (20, 21) to be mounted by operators at least for unlocking. This is no longer permitted by recent legal regulations. A coupling means (26) according to the invention is designed in such a way that at least one (lower) coupling projection (32) is displaceable relative to the containers (20, 21) to be connected. This results in automatic and reliable interlocking of the containers (20, 21). Additionally, jamming is avoided when the connection is released as a result of slight tilting of the upper container (20). The coupling means (26) is particularly suitable for automatic interlocking and unlocking of closely stowed containers (20, 21), in particular 20' containers (20, 21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/0013 (2013.01); Y10T 24/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0477887 A1 19920401; EP 0477887 B1 19960131; EP 0477887 B2 20000906; DE 4030336 A1 19920326; DE 4030336 C2 20010322; DE 4042710 C2 20021128; DE 59107335 D1 19960314; DK 0477887 T3 19960701; DK 0477887 T4 20001218; ES 2082901 T3 19960401; ES 2082901 T5 20001201; US 5560088 A 19961001

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110926

2013-07-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130719

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110926

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110925

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110924

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-10-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20110924

2011-10-10 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2011-10-05 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20110925

2011-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *MACGREGOR-CONVER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20110925

2011-09-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59107335

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2001-01-05 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-12-18 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2000-12-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-11-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-10-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SEC SHIP'S EQUIPMENT CENTRE BREMEN GMBH

2000-09-27 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-09-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SEC SHIP'S EQUIPMENT CENTRE BREMEN GMBH

- Effective date: 19961025

1997-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SEC SHIP'S EQUIPMENT CENTRE BREMEN GMBH

1997-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SEC SHIP'S EQUIPMENT CENTRE BREMEN GMBH

- Effective date: 19961025

1996-07-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

1996-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1996-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2082901

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1996-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1996-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59107335

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-03-14

1996-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19960208

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1995-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MACGREGOR-CONVER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1994-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19940407

1992-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19920501

1992-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE