Global Patent Index - EP 0478099 B1

EP 0478099 B1 2000-07-12 - Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Einspritzvorrichtung einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0478099 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91250240 A

Priority

  • JP 25733690 A
  • JP 26936990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0478099A2] The present invention relates to a high pressure oil generating apparatus of an internal combustion engine for driving valves or devices installed in the internal combustion engine with working oil. The construction consists of a cam having one and more lobes fixed to a crank shaft as one body, one and more jerk type high pressure pumps operated by the cam, a working oil source for feeding working oil to the high pressure pumps, an accumulator for accumulating high pressure working oil discharged from respective high pressure pumps and a control means, and is characterized in that the rack positions of above-mentioned respective high pressure pumps are adjusted and the working oil pressure is controlled at a predetermined pressure by the control means. Thus, the high pressure oil generating apparatus is applied practically for controlling the fuel injection quantity of the internal combustion engine and for controlling a suction/discharge valve, and particularly for controlling operation of a discharge valve. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/06; F01L 9/02; F02M 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/105 (2013.01); F01L 9/02 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F02M 59/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0478099 A2 19920401; EP 0478099 A3 19940914; EP 0478099 B1 20000712; DE 69132307 D1 20000817; DE 69132307 T2 20010201; DK 0478099 T3 20000918; KR 940004358 B1 19940523

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-09-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2002-09-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-08-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-08-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69132307 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

1995-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950907

1994-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI

1992-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920623

1992-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI