Global patent index - EP 0481867 B2

EP 0481867 B2 2000-02-02 - Woven or weft knitted textile support for fusible interlining

Title (en)

Woven or weft knitted textile support for fusible interlining

Title (de)

Gewebter oder schussgewirkter Textilsupport für einbügelbaren Einlagestoff

Title (fr)

Support textile, tissé ou tricoté trame, pour entoilage thermocollant

Publication

EP 0481867 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 91402738 A

Priority

FR 9013134 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0481867A1] The textile support for fusible interlining consists of a woven fabric or of a woven-mesh knitted fabric. According to the invention, at least the weft of the woven or weft-knitted fabric is made from synthetic yarns, for example of 35 to 500 dtex composed of fine filaments of less than 1.3 dtex. These weft yarns are preferably textured. …<??>The fusible interlining consists of the above-mentioned woven or weft-knitted fabric, on one face of which spots of heat-fusible polymer have been deposited.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 27/06; D03D 15/00; D04B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/06 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/16 (2006.01); D06M 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/06 (2013.01); D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0077 (2013.01); D04B 1/16 (2013.01); D10B 2331/02 (2013.01); D10B 2331/04 (2013.01); D10B 2401/062 (2013.01); D10B 2501/06 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2481 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24818 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0481867 A1 19920422; EP 0481867 B1 19950111; EP 0481867 B2 20000202; AT 116816 T 19950115; CA 2052567 C 19950815; DE 69106661 D1 19950223; DE 69106661 T2 19950518; DE 69106661 T3 20010809; DK 0481867 T3 19950320; DK 0481867 T4 20000619; ES 2069849 T3 19950516; ES 2069849 T5 20000616; FI 914858 A0 19911015; FI 914858 A 19920418; FI 94879 B 19950731; FI 94879 C 19951110; FR 2668177 A1 19920424; FR 2668177 B1 19940603; GR 3015687 T3 19950731; GR 3033270 T3 20000929; JP 2912747 B2 19990628; JP H0693569 A 19940405; KR 182309 B1 19990501; PT 99229 A 19931130; PT 99229 B 20010531; TR 26642 A 19950315; US 5153049 A 19921006

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111015

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111013

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111014

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111015

2012-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 116816

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111014

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-11-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20111013

2011-10-26 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20111014

2011-10-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69106661

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100917

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LAINERIE DE PICARDIE BC (S.A.S.)

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LAINERIE DE PICARDIE BC (S.A.S.)

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-09-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-18 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2002-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CHARGETEX 16

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2002-01-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE BC

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Free Format Text: 20010924 *LAINERIE DE PICARDIE BC (S.A.S.):BUIRE COURCELLES, 80200 PERONNE

2001-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE TRANSFER- LAINIERE DE PICARDI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2001-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2000-06-19 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2000-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2000-04-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-05 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-02-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-02-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KUFNER TEXTILWERKE GMBH

1995-12-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KUFNER TEXTILWERKE GMBH

- Effective date: 19951010

1995-06-30 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4A

- Free Format Text: 3015687

1995-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2069849

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1995-03-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

1995-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69106661

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-02-23

1995-02-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19950119

1995-01-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & MITTLER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1995-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 116816

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1993-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19930924

1992-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19920401

1992-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE