Global Patent Index - EP 0482166 B2

EP 0482166 B2 2000-05-17 - JET DYEING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

JET DYEING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

JETFÄRBENVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TEINTURE PAR TUYERES

Publication

EP 0482166 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 91909184 A

Priority

  • EP 9100896 W
  • GR 90100361 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9118141A1] An improved jet dyeing apparatus is provided which enables the user to dye either lightweight or relatively heavy weight fabrics (1) in the same apparatus with improved efficiency and product quality. The apparatus includes a unique fabric plaiting mechanism (7) which is mounted to the exit end of a transport tube (11) for relative rotation about the transport tube (11) whereby a downwardly directed outlet nozzle (15) defined by the plaiting mechanism (7) reciprocates along a generally linear path of travel transverse to the transport tube (11) and such that the fabric (1) passing through the transport tube (11) will be deposited in a liquid treatment chamber (10) in overlying relatively straight folds in order to maximize capacity in the dyeing apparatus and to improve the stability of the fabric being treated therein. Furthermore, in accordance with an additional aspect of the invention, higher capacities may be achieved through use of a transport tube (11) which utilizes a plurality of liquor sprayer systems (3, 4) and which is preferably v-shaped in profile so that a first transport zone is provided which is preferably downwardly inclined at a mild angle and a second transport zone is defined which is generally upwardly inclined with the plaiting nozzle. The invention also includes the related method of dyeing a textile material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9118141 A1 19911128; AT 141658 T 19960915; AU 7862091 A 19911210; DE 69121514 D1 19960926; DE 69121514 T2 19970213; DE 69121514 T3 20050407; EP 0482166 A1 19920429; EP 0482166 B1 19960821; EP 0482166 B2 20000517; ES 2091927 T3 19961116; ES 2091927 T5 20000716; GR 1000210 B 19920417; HK 93597 A 19970801

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080511

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050512

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-05-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-02-03 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8570

2004-05-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040518

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030511

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030511

2002-05-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LUNATI & MAZZONI S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-07-07 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-06-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-05-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FONG'S NATIONAL ENGINEERING CO. LTD.

- Effective date: 19970521

1997-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

1996-11-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19961121

1996-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2091927

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1996-11-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LUNATI & MAZZONI S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1996-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1996-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69121514

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-09-26

1996-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-08-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960821

1996-08-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960821

1996-08-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960821

1996-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 141658

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1994-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19940630

1992-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19920520

1992-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE