Global patent index - EP 0485542 B2

EP 0485542 B2 2000-06-28 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SETTING UP A THREE-CUTTER MACHINE

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR SETTING UP A THREE-CUTTER MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINRICHTEN EINES DREISCHNEIDERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE MASSICOTS TRILATERAUX

Publication

EP 0485542 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91907697 A

Priority

  • DE 9100356 W
  • DE 4013904 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9116181A1] A process and device are disclosed for setting up a three-cutter machine by adjusting the supply station, the transfer station, the cutting station and the ejector according to a book format to be cut or in order to carry out maintenance work. During a computer-controlled setting up operation predetermined optimal positions for adjusting cutting parameters or for carrying out maintenance work are purposefully adjusted within one or several machine cycles. Static adjustment steps or maintenance steps are then automatically carried out in these positions, controlled by a computer, and/or adjustment steps to be manually carried out are presented on an electronic display device. In the latter case, these steps are then manually carried out and acknowledged by the control computer. Complementary dynamic adjustement steps can be carried out during operation of the three-cutter machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 15/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/09 (2006.01); B26D 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B26D 1/09 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9116181 A1 19911031; AT 129455 T 19951115; DE 4113797 A1 19911107; DE 4113797 C2 19950817; EP 0485542 A1 19920520; EP 0485542 B1 19951025; EP 0485542 B2 20000628; ES 2081474 T3 19960301; JP H04507070 A 19921210

INPADOC legal status

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-04-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050424

2002-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20020204

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-14 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-06-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-07-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 19990503

1998-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

1998-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 19971101

1997-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971231

1997-12-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 19970424

1997-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19971101

1997-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WOHLENBERG VERTRIEBS- UND SERVICE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 19970430

1997-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970430

1997-04-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970425

1997-04-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970424

1997-04-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970424

1996-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KOLBUS GMBH & CO. KG

1996-09-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KOLBUS GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 19960718

1996-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19960430

1996-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19960430

- Year of fee payment: 6

1996-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19960430

- Year of fee payment: 6

1996-04-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19960422

- Year of fee payment: 6

1996-04-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19960422

- Year of fee payment: 6

1996-04-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19960409

- Year of fee payment: 6

1996-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19960318

- Year of fee payment: 6

1996-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2081474

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1996-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19960106

1996-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1996-01-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59106764

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-11-30

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1995-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 129455

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1994-08-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WOHLENBERG VERTRIEBS- UND SERVICE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1994-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19940601

1992-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19920121

1992-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL