Global Patent Index - EP 0486295 B1

EP 0486295 B1 2001-02-14 - Semiconductor memory device with redundant circuit

Title (en)

Semiconductor memory device with redundant circuit

Title (de)

Halbleiterspeichergerät mit redundanter Schaltung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteur à circuit de redondance

Publication

EP 0486295 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91310506 A

Priority

JP 31204490 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0486295A2] A semiconductor memory device has regular memory cells (RC1 - RCm) arranged in rows and columns, and, when one of the regular memory cells in a row is defective, the row is replaced with redundant memory cells (RCr - RCs). A fuse element (34) is then broken so as to isolate the power supply line (BL1/BLn) associated with the row from the main power supply line (GND) so that a defective memory cell does not consume any current, thereby improving the power consumption of the semiconductor memory device, and avoiding the need to reject the device due to large current consumption. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 11/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 11/413 (2006.01); G11C 11/401 (2006.01); G11C 11/407 (2006.01); G11C 29/00 (2006.01); G11C 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 29/83 (2013.01); G11C 29/832 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0486295 A2 19920520; EP 0486295 A3 19930728; EP 0486295 B1 20010214; DE 69132533 D1 20010322; DE 69132533 T2 20010809; JP 2782948 B2 19980806; JP H04182989 A 19920630; KR 960005367 B1 19960424; US 5295114 A 19940315

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041114

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041114

2003-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-04-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69132533 20010322

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951227

1993-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1992-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19911205

1992-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB