Global Patent Index - EP 0493375 B1

EP 0493375 B1 2000-04-19 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0493375 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92105421 A

Priority

  • EP 87305575 A
  • GB 8615272 A
  • GB 8626901 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0493375A2] An underwater electrical connector comprises male and female parts (1,2) which are brought together to make an electrical connection. The female part (1) includes outer, intermediate and inner closed chambers (28,29,30) containing electrically insulating fluid media, the intermediate chamber (29) being located within the outer chamber (28), and the inner chamber (30) being located within the intermediate chamber (29). An electrically insulating shuttle piston (46) extends through a contact socket (23) disposed in the inner chamber (30) and through respective aligned openings (40,41,42) of the inner chambers. The shuttle piston (46) is arranged to be urged back by a contact pin (3) of the male part of the connector during insertion thereof such that the contact pin is received and directly engaged by the contact socket (23) in the inner chamber (30) to effect the electrical connection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/523

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/523 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/523 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0493375 A2 19920701; EP 0493375 A3 19920826; EP 0493375 B1 20000419; GB 8615272 D0 19860730; GB 8626901 D0 19861210

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20070622

2007-07-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-06-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-04-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 251655

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL SE

2000-04-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRONIC LIMITED

1993-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19931108

1992-12-23 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19921026

1992-11-19 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

1992-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920629

1992-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL SE

1992-07-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 251655

1992-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL SE