Global Patent Index - EP 0496063 B2

EP 0496063 B2 2000-07-05 - Screen surface for screening machine

Title (en)

Screen surface for screening machine

Title (de)

Siebfläche für eine Siebmaschine

Title (fr)

Surface criblante pour appareil cribleur

Publication

EP 0496063 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91120873 A

Priority

DE 4101710 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0496063A2] The invention relates to a screen surface for a screening machine in which first areas of the elastic screening surface oscillate in a different manner from second areas of the screen surface, the screen surface being composed of individual components which have an outer frame which is driven to oscillate and in whose inner area at least one inner part is mounted by means of spring elements, the screen surface being attached alternately to the frame and to the spring-mounted inner part(s). …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/46; B07B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/28 (2006.01); B07B 1/46 (2006.01); B07B 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/485 (2013.01); B07B 1/28 (2013.01); B07B 1/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0496063 A2 19920729; EP 0496063 A3 19930310; EP 0496063 B1 19941117; EP 0496063 B2 20000705; AT 114121 T 19941215; DE 4101710 A1 19920723; ES 2064029 T3 19950116; US 5193689 A 19930316

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091205

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051205

2001-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

1999-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 19981205

1999-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEIN LEHMANN TRENN- UND FORDERTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 19981231

1999-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ISENMANN SIEBE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 19981231

1998-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981231

1998-12-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 19981207

1998-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981205

1997-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971231

- Year of fee payment: 7

1997-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971211

- Year of fee payment: 7

1997-12-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971208

- Year of fee payment: 7

1997-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971128

- Year of fee payment: 7

1997-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971112

- Year of fee payment: 7

1995-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BINDER & CO. AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1995-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CARL SCHENCK AG

1995-10-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BINDER & CO. AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19950811

1995-10-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CARL SCHENCK AG

- Effective date: 19950815

1995-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2064029

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1995-01-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19941129

1994-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59103541

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1994-12-22

1994-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1994-11-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19941117

1994-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 114121

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1994-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1993-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19930609

1993-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19930204

1993-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1992-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL