Global Patent Index - EP 0496829 B1

EP 0496829 B1 2000-12-06 - LPC BASED SPEECH SYNTHESIS WITH ADAPTIVE PITCH PREFILTER

Title (en)

LPC BASED SPEECH SYNTHESIS WITH ADAPTIVE PITCH PREFILTER

Title (de)

AUF DEM LPC-VERFAHREN BERUHENDE SPRACHSYNTHESE MIT ADAPTIVEM PITCHVORFILTER

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE DE PAROLE A BASE DE CODAGE A PREDICTION LINEAIRE UTILISANT UN PREFILTRE DE PITCH ADAPTATIF

Publication

EP 0496829 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 90916987 A

Priority

  • US 42287189 A
  • US 9005191 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9106091A1] A linear predictive coding speech synthetizer wherein an excitation signal that includes pitch information is filtered in a pitch enhancement filter (201) prior to provision of the excitation signal to an LPC filter (106). In one embodiment, the speech synthesizer is configured in a radio.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/26 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9106091 A1 19910502; AU 644119 B2 19931202; AU 6725690 A 19910516; CA 2066568 A1 19910418; CN 1051100 A 19910501; DE 69033672 D1 20010111; DE 69033672 T2 20010510; EP 0496829 A1 19920805; EP 0496829 A4 19930818; EP 0496829 B1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100917

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100916

2010-10-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20100916

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090807

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033672 20010111

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 19/08 A

1996-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960514

1993-08-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19930702

1993-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1992-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920514

1992-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB