Global Patent Index - EP 0498464 B2

EP 0498464 B2 2000-12-27 - Reduced driven yarn brake for the yarnfurnisher of a knitting machine or the like

Title (en)

Reduced driven yarn brake for the yarnfurnisher of a knitting machine or the like

Title (de)

Untersetzt angetriebene Fadenbremse für den Fadenzubringer einer Strickmaschine oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Frein de fil à entraînement démultiplié pour le fournisseur de fil d'un métier à tricoter ou pareil

Publication

EP 0498464 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92102106 A

Priority

  • DE 4103884 A
  • DE 4114519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0498464A2] In a yarn brake for the yarn furnisher of a knitting machine or the like, having various guide devices (4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9) fastened to a feeder housing (2) and intended for the run of the yarn (1) supplied from a supply station to a processing station of the machine, and having a yarn-winding body (10) which is arranged rotatably on one side of the housing and which can be driven by a drive shaft (11) mounted in the feeder housing (2), the yarn brake (7) is arranged on the feeder housing (2) at a location in front of the yarn-winding body (10) and has two brake discs (15, 16) which are mounted on an axle (17) and are pressed against one another by means of adjustable spring pressure and between which the yarn (1) runs through. The axle (17) of the yarn brake (7) is designed as a driven axle and is so connected to a drive (14, 23) that the yarn brake (7) has a lower rotational speed than the yarn-winding body (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/44; B65H 59/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0498464 A2 19920812; EP 0498464 A3 19921202; EP 0498464 B1 19951122; EP 0498464 B2 20001227; DE 4114519 A1 19921105; ES 2081509 T3 19960301

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050207

2003-09-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-02-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030208

2002-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHLAICH WERNER

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-06-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19951122

2001-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-12-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-02-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-01-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000128

- Year of fee payment: 9

1996-10-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MEMMINGER - IRO GMBH

- Effective date: 19960821

1996-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2081509 T3

1996-03-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960106

1996-01-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

1996-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59204382 19960104

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1995-11-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19951122

1995-11-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19951122

1995-02-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19941215

1993-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930601

1992-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1992-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE