EP 0502104 A4 19940330 -
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 43960189 A 19891121
- US 48024290 A 19900215
- US 9006729 W 19901116
Abstract (en)
[origin: US5673299A] An adjunct call processor connected to a communications network for providing call processing services. The network includes a switching system including a switch for concurrently servicing a plurality of communications paths and a switch controller for controlling the switch, the switch controller being responsive to switching commands communicated to it. The adjunct call processor is coupled to the switching system for (i) automatically receiving a call from a caller which has been switched to the adjunct call processor by the switching system, (ii) interacting with the caller, and (iii) based on that interaction, transmitting one or more of the switching commands to the switching system causing the call to be handled by the switching system externally of the adjunct call processor.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/27 (2006.01); H04M 1/56 (2006.01); H04M 1/64 (2006.01); H04M 1/652 (2006.01); H04M 1/658 (2006.01); H04M 1/66 (2006.01); H04M 1/665 (2006.01); H04M 3/38 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/428 (2006.01); H04M 3/436 (2006.01); H04M 3/527 (2006.01); H04M 3/54 (2006.01); H04M 11/00 (2006.01); H04M 11/02 (2006.01); H04Q 3/00 (2006.01); H04Q 3/54 (2006.01); H04Q 3/545 (2006.01); H04Q 3/62 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01); H04W 4/16 (2009.01); H04W 76/02 (2009.01); H04M 3/00 (2006.01); H04M 3/487 (2006.01); H04M 3/53 (2006.01); H04M 3/533 (2006.01); H04M 3/537 (2006.01); H04M 3/56 (2006.01); H04Q 3/72 (2006.01); H04W 4/12 (2009.01); H04W 8/16 (2009.01); H04W 8/18 (2009.01); H04W 68/00 (2009.01); H04W 68/12 (2009.01); H04W 84/02 (2009.01); H04W 88/02 (2009.01); H04W 88/18 (2009.01); H04W 92/02 (2009.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H04M 1/006 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 1/27 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 1/652 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 1/658 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 1/665 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/382 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/42 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/42229 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/428 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/436 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/527 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/54 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 11/00 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 11/022 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/005 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/54 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/542 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/54525 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/54566 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/54591 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/622 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/625 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/627 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 11/0457 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 4/16 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 76/10 (2018.02 - EP US); H04M 3/005 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/42042 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/42059 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/42093 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/42102 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/487 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/53 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/533 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/537 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 3/56 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 2203/2005 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 2203/2011 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 2203/2072 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 2242/22 (2013.01 - EP US); H04M 2242/30 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 3/72 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1305 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13072 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13091 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13093 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13095 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13097 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13098 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13102 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13103 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13106 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13141 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1315 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13173 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13174 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13175 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1318 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13204 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13209 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13213 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13216 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1322 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13222 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13224 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1324 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1325 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13256 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1326 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13271 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13274 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13282 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13286 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13299 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13305 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/1332 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13322 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13331 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13374 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13376 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13377 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13385 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13405 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13513 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13515 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13532 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13533 (2013.01 - EP US); H04Q 2213/13547 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 4/12 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 8/16 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 8/18 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 68/00 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 68/12 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 84/022 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 88/022 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 88/185 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 92/02 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10S 379/913 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 4752951 A 19880621 - KONNEKER LLOYD K [US]
- [X] US 4277649 A 19810707 - SHEINBEIN DANIEL
- [Y] US 4369339 A 19830118 - CASTRO MARCELO [AR], et al
- [Y] EP 0330441 A2 19890830 - OPCOM [US]
- [A] GB 2198910 A 19880622 - STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD
- [A] EP 0152908 A2 19850828 - NEC CORP [JP]
- [A] US 4680785 A 19870714 - AKIYAMA TADAHIKO [JP], et al
- [X] US 4740788 A 19880426 - KONNEKER LLOYD K [US]
- [Y] US 4150255 A 19790417 - THEIS PETER F, et al
- [A] DE 3411206 A1 19851010 - TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH [DE]
- [A] EP 0216381 A2 19870401 - AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]
- [X] EP 0216515 A2 19870401 - VOICETEK CORP [US]
- [A] EP 0046623 A2 19820303 - AUTOPHON AG [CH]
- [A] FR 2541020 A1 19840817 - JEUMONT SCHNEIDER [FR]
- [Y] WO 8304451 A1 19831222 - STORNO AS [DK]
- [A] DE 2929961 A1 19810212 - ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 435 (E-825) 28 September 1989 & JP-A-1 162 063 ( NEC CORP ) 26 June 1989
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 414 (E-677)2 November 1988 & JP-A-63 152 258 ( NEC CORP ) 24 June 1988
- [Y] IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 26, no. 5, October 1983, NEW YORK US pages 2645 - 2647 D.ZEHEB 'SECRETARIAL BRANCH EXCHANGE'
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 70 (E-56)12 May 1981 & JP-A-56 020 367 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 25 February 1981
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 288 (E-218)22 December 1983 & JP-A-58 165 469 ( FUJITSU KK ) 30 September 1983
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9107838 A1 19910530; AT E212166 T1 20020215; AU 1354995 A 19950504; AU 654943 B2 19941201; AU 6900891 A 19910613; AU 695947 B2 19980827; CA 2069003 A1 19910522; CA 2069003 C 20010206; DE 69033901 D1 20020221; EP 0502104 A1 19920909; EP 0502104 A4 19940330; EP 0502104 B1 20020116; JP H05505285 A 19930805; SG 38930 A1 20030318; US 5375161 A 19941220; US 5610970 A 19970311; US 5673299 A 19970930; US 5694453 A 19971202; US 5751760 A 19980512; US 5838779 A 19981117; US 5841837 A 19981124; US 5842112 A 19981124; US 5907600 A 19990525; US 6021190 A 20000201; US 6026149 A 20000215; US 6026153 A 20000215; US 6067443 A 20000523; US 6104912 A 20000815; US 6122484 A 20000919; US 6167128 A 20001226; US 6185283 B1 20010206; US 6332082 B1 20011218
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9006729 W 19901116; AT 91900514 T 19901116; AU 1354995 A 19950301; AU 6900891 A 19901116; CA 2069003 A 19901116; DE 69033901 T 19901116; EP 91900514 A 19901116; JP 50107191 A 19901116; SG 1996001992 A 19901116; US 24945394 A 19940526; US 35308194 A 19941209; US 36831094 A 19941230; US 41509099 A 19991008; US 42828295 A 19950425; US 42990795 A 19950427; US 42990895 A 19950427; US 43659395 A 19950508; US 43925495 A 19950511; US 43925695 A 19950511; US 44775195 A 19950523; US 45482695 A 19950531; US 45508395 A 19950531; US 45926695 A 19950602; US 47649495 A 19950607; US 48024290 A 19900215; US 48278795 A 19950607; US 48734095 A 19950607