Global Patent Index - EP 0502877 B1

EP 0502877 B1 2001-05-16 - PROCESS FOR RECOVERING CONDENSABLE COMPONENTS FROM GAS STREAMS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR RECOVERING CONDENSABLE COMPONENTS FROM GAS STREAMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON KONDENSIERBAREN KOMPONENTEN AUS GASSTRÖMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION D'UN CONSTITUANT CONDENSABLE DE COURANTS GAZEUX

Publication

EP 0502877 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 90917042 A

Priority

  • US 43259289 A
  • US 9006343 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9106363A1] A process for treating a gas stream to remove or recover a condensable component. The process involves a condensation step and a membrane concentration step. The condensation step may be followed by the membrane step, or vice versa. The process can be designed to yield only two product streams: one, the condensed liquid (5), ready for use, reuse of discard, and two, a residue gas stream (8), which in most cases will be clean enough for direct discharge or reuse. This result is achieved by recycling other streams within the process. Recovery of 90 % or more of the condensable component can be achieved. The process offers substantial energy savings compared with condensation alone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/22; B01D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/22 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9106363 A1 19910516; AT 201148 T 20010615; CA 2073038 A1 19910508; CA 2073038 C 20000808; DE 69033734 D1 20010621; DE 69033734 T2 20010830; EP 0502877 A1 19920916; EP 0502877 A4 19930407; EP 0502877 B1 20010516; ES 2158838 T3 20010916; US 5089033 A 19920218; US 5089033 B1 19950221

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-08-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-08-27 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20030331

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIHI ANLAGENTECHNIK GMBH

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BORSIG GMBH

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GKSS-FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GEESTHACHT GMBH

2002-12-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021204

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIHI ANLAGENTECHNIK GMBH

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BORSIG GMBH

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GKSS-FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GEESTHACHT GMBH

2002-04-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIHI ANLAGENTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-04-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BORSIG GMBH

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-04-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GKSS-FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GEESTHACHT GMBH

- Effective date: 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158838 T3

2001-08-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033734 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201148 T 20010615

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 01D 53/22 A, 7B 01D 5/00 B

2000-07-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR RECOVERING CONDENSABLE COMPONENTS FROM GAS STREAMS

2000-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 01D 53/22 A, 7B 01D 5/00 B

2000-06-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR RECOVERING CONDENSABLE COMPONENTS FROM GAS STREAMS

1994-10-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940902

1993-04-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19930212

1993-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1992-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920525

1992-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE