Global Patent Index - EP 0508036 B2

EP 0508036 B2 2000-06-14 - Sliding door, especially for the ends of a railway carriage

Title (en)

Sliding door, especially for the ends of a railway carriage

Title (de)

Schiebetüre, insbesondere an der Stirnseite, eines Eisenbahnwaggons

Title (fr)

Porte coulissante, notamment pour les extrémités d'une voiture ferroviaire

Publication

EP 0508036 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91890072 A

Priority

EP 91890072 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0508036A1] Sliding door (1) at the end of a railway waggon for passenger transport, having two door leaves (3, 4) which can be moved apart and together, preferably linear guides (6) cooperating with the upper area or lower area of the door leaves (3, 4) and it being possible to seal the door leaves (3, 4) on the railway waggon with respect to the door frame (2) via at least one inflatable seal (20), the door leaves (3, 4) being lockable in the closed position by means of a locking device (13, 14) and adjoining one another directly, for example via respective seals (11, 12) of the door leaves (3, 4). The door leaves (3, 4) have, in addition to the closing device (13, 14) of the sliding door (1), hooks (15, 18) which cooperate in the closed position with receiving elements (16, 19) of the door frame (2) or of the railway waggon, by which means the door leaves (3, 4) can be fixed in their position transversely with respect to the guides (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 19/02; B61D 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/20 (2006.01); B61D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/20 (2013.01); B61D 19/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0508036 A1 19921014; EP 0508036 B1 19930811; EP 0508036 B2 20000614; AT 92863 T 19930815; DE 59100293 D1 19930916

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110410

2011-04-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59100293

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-04-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050410

2000-09-01 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-08-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-06-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1999-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990430

1999-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990430

1999-04-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990410

1998-07-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 19980714

- Year of fee payment: 8

1998-03-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19980302

- Year of fee payment: 8

1994-06-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IFE INDUSTRIE-EINRICHTUNGEN FERTIGUNGS-AKTIENGESEL

- Effective date: 19940502

1994-06-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GEBR. BODE & CO. GMBH

- Effective date: 19940505

1993-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1993-10-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILA

1993-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59100293 19930916

1993-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1993-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 92863 T 19930815

1992-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920227

1992-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI