Global patent index - EP 0509230 B2

EP 0509230 B2 2000-09-27 - Feed mechanism for a cutting machine for cutting edible products

Title (en)

Feed mechanism for a cutting machine for cutting edible products

Title (de)

Vorschubantrieb für eine Schneidemaschine zum Schneiden von Lebensmittelprodukten

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'avancement pour une machine de coupe pour couper des produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 0509230 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92104051 A

Priority

DE 9104588 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0509230A2] A feed mechanism for a cutting machine for cutting edible products consists of a claw which digs into the product on the rear face of the product to be cut, the claw being driven intermittently or continuously in the feed direction and guiding the product on a roller conveyor towards a cutting device, so that slices are cut off the product. To improve the guidance of the product and to avoid uneven slices, in particular with long products of soft consistency, provision is made for a further non-positive and positive drive for the product to be provided, coupled to the drive of the claw at the front end of the product in the vicinity of the circular cutter of the cutting device, which further drive consists of at least one feed roll which engages non-positively and positively on the underside of the product and is driven in rotation in dependence on the feed path of the claw. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/28 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/0616 (2013.01); B26D 7/01 (2013.01); B26D 2007/011 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4632 (2015.04); Y10T 83/654 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6572 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6579 (2015.04); Y10T 83/658 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6619 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9104588 U1 19911017; EP 0509230 A2 19921021; EP 0509230 A3 19930623; EP 0509230 B1 19950927; EP 0509230 B2 20000927; EP 0509230 B9 20020313; JP H05104492 A 19930427; US 5191820 A 19930309

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090310

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080310

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-11-17 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-10-18 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-09-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1996-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

1996-08-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DIXIE-UNION VERPACKUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 19960626

1996-08-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FIRMA WEBER MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 19960627

1996-08-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DIXIE-UNION VERPACKUNGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 19960626

1996-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960331

1996-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960331

1996-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1996-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19960106

1995-12-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59203791

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-11-02

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1995-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950117

1994-12-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCHINENBAU HEINRICH HAJEK GMBH & CO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1993-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19931007

1993-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1992-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI