Global Patent Index - EP 0510249 B1

EP 0510249 B1 2000-03-08 - Cold reduced non-aging deep drawing steel and method for producing

Title (en)

Cold reduced non-aging deep drawing steel and method for producing

Title (de)

Kaltverformtes und nichtalterndes Tiefziehblech aus Stahl und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Tôle en acier formé à froid pour emboutissage avec une résistance au vieilissement et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0510249 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91114828 A

Priority

  • US 69014291 A
  • US 72096691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0510249A2] A cold reduced, non-aging, aluminum killed steel characterized by an elongated grain structure and having an rm value at least 1.8 produced from a slab having a reduced hot rolling temperature. A slab consisting essentially of </= 0.08% carbon, </= 0.1% acid sol. aluminum, </= 0.2% manganese, all percentages by weight, the balance iron and unavoidable impurities, is hot rolled to a sheet from a temperature less than 1260 DEG C. Preferably, the slab is continuously cast from a melt consisting essentially of 0.03-0.08% acid sol. aluminum, 0.003-0.007% total nitrogen, < 0.20% manganese, wherein % acid sol. aluminum x % total nitrogen is within the range of 1 x 10<-><4> to 5 x 10<-><4> and is hot rolled from a temperature of 1093-1175 DEG C. The hot rolled sheet is descaled, cold reduced, batch annealed and temper rolled. Preferably, the cold reduced sheet is annealed in the range of 538-649 DEG C and the temper rolled sheet has a tensile strength of 284.5-313.9 N/mm<2> (29-32 kg/mm<2>), a total elongation of at least 42% and an rm value of at least 2.0.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0510249 A2 19921028; EP 0510249 A3 19930908; EP 0510249 B1 20000308; AT 190359 T 20000315; DE 69132028 D1 20000413; DE 69132028 T2 20000928; ES 2144396 T3 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-06-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AK STEEL CORP.

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-09-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-10-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001006

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-09-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000908

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144396 T3

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69132028 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190359 T 20000315

1995-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950925

1995-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AK STEEL CORPORATION

1994-04-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940225

1993-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1992-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE