Global Patent Index - EP 0510291 B2

EP 0510291 B2 2000-04-26 - Method of and device for manufacture of threaded cans made of aluminium

Title (en)

Method of and device for manufacture of threaded cans made of aluminium

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Aluminiumdosen mit Gewinde

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la manufacture de boîtes filetées en aluminium

Publication

EP 0510291 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91810599 A

Priority

CH 114991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0510291A1] Deep-drawn, deep-drawn and stretched or extruded, cylindrical aluminium cans are coated inside and outside, provided with a two-stage neck (10, 20) by drawing-in, onto which neck a thread (30) is rolled, and then cut to length, the drawing-in of the neck, the thread-rolling and the cutting-to-length being carried out in the same clamping operation on the can. The coating used is mixed with a catalyst, plasticiser and/or lubricant to increase its flexibility, to increase its adhesiveness and to improve its sliding properties. The thread is rolled by the can neck being supported from inside by a virtually stationary thread template (40) while a thread roller (50) is rolled over the surface of the neck from outside, the said roller pressing the thread inwards into the neck. Thread template and thread roller are positively controlled in such a way that a slipping is produced between them and the material of the neck. As a result, the coating remains intact even in the region of the thread.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 51/24; B21H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/40 (2006.01); B21D 51/24 (2006.01); B21D 51/38 (2006.01); B21H 3/04 (2006.01); B23G 7/00 (2006.01); B65D 1/00 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 1/16 (2006.01); B65D 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/38 (2013.01); B21D 51/24 (2013.01); B21H 3/04 (2013.01); B65D 1/0246 (2013.01); B65D 1/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0510291 A1 19921028; EP 0510291 B1 19950308; EP 0510291 B2 20000426; AT 119441 T 19950315; DE 59104891 D1 19950413; ES 2073722 T3 19950816; ES 2073722 T5 20001101; JP 3375661 B2 20030210; JP H05229545 A 19930907; US 5293765 A 19940315

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050727

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050726

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2004-09-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040717

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-09-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-08-11 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-07-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-05-17 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-05-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-05-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 03/2000: THE DECISION OF REJECTING OPPOSITION SHOULD BE DELETED (SEE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 08.03.2000/10).

2000-04-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-08 [D27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED (DELETED)

2000-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: E. NUSSBAUM & GUHL A.G.

- Effective date: 19990731

2000-01-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 19990921

1999-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990731

1999-07-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990726

1999-07-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990726

1998-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 19980731

- Year of fee payment: 8

1998-07-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19980723

- Year of fee payment: 8

1998-07-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 19980723

- Year of fee payment: 8

1997-01-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

1997-01-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

1996-11-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NUSSBAUM & GUHL AG

1996-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FRATTINI SPA CONSTRUZIONI MECCANICHE

1996-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ENVASES UK LIMITED

1996-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NUSSBAUM & GUHL AG

1996-01-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRATTINI SPA CONSTRUZIONI MECCANICHE

- Effective date: 19951205

1996-01-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ENVASES UK LIMITED

- Effective date: 19951207

1996-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NUSSBAUM & GUHL AG

1995-12-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: E. NUSSBAUM AG TRANSFER- NUSSBAUM & GUHL AG

1995-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2073722 T3

1995-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19950531

1995-06-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19950608

1995-05-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1995-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59104891 19950413

1995-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1995-03-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Effective date: 19950308

1995-03-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950308

1995-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 119441 T 19950315

1993-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930823

1993-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930331

1992-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE