EP 0510680 A3 19930421 - ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTING APPARATUS HAVING AN ENDLESS BELT FOR PRIMARY AND SECONDARY TRANSFER
Title (en)
ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTING APPARATUS HAVING AN ENDLESS BELT FOR PRIMARY AND SECONDARY TRANSFER
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 9592991 A 19910426
- JP 13641091 A 19910607
- JP 13641191 A 19910607
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0510680A2] An electrophotographic printing apparatus comprises: an image forming means for forming a toner image having a first polarity on a photosensitive member (4); an endless belt (7) having releaseability and moving relative to said photosensitive member (4) while holding its front surface opposite to a surface of said photosensitive member (4); first transfer means (5) provided on a position at a rear surface of said endless belt (7) opposite to said photosensitive member (4) for transferring said toner image onto said front surface of said endless belt (7) by generating an electric charge having a second polarity reverse to said first polarity; and second transfer means (8, 11) for pressing a sheet (12) of paper carried on said front surface of said endless belt (7) together with said endless belt and thereby transferring said toner image onto said sheet (12) of paper. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G03G 15/16 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G03G 15/1605 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] DE 3128402 A1 19820415 - KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]
- [A] US 4341455 A 19820727 - FEDDER RICHARD C
- [A] EP 0373704 A1 19900620 - OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 325 (P-1075)12 July 1990 & JP-A-02 108 072 ( FUJITSU ) 19 April 1990
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 19 (P-814)18 January 1989 & JP-A-63 223 678 ( CANON K.K. ) 19 September 1988
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 259 (P-317)(1696) 28 November 1984 & JP-A-59 131 958 ( FUJITSU K.K. )
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 86 (P-269)19 April 1984 & JP-A-59 002 068 ( FUJITSU K.K. ) 7 January 1984
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 153 (P-287)17 July 1984 & JP-A-59 050 474 ( KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K. ) 23 March 1984
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 321 (P-1074)10 July 1990 & JP-A-02 105 168 ( FUJI XEROX ) 17 April 1990
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 92107046 A 19920424