Global Patent Index - EP 0511543 B2

EP 0511543 B2 2001-12-19 - Roller for a printing machine

Title (en)

Roller for a printing machine

Title (de)

Walze für eine Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Rouleau pour machine d'imprimerie

Publication

EP 0511543 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92106398 A

Priority

DE 4113903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0511543A1] A process for producing a partially hydrophilic and partially oleophilic surface of an inking system roller is described, wherein a hydrophilic material, for example a ceramic, is introduced into recesses in an oleophilic metal layer of, for example, copper. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/26 (2006.01); B41F 31/00 (2006.01); B41N 7/00 (2006.01); B41N 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 7/00 (2013.01); B41N 7/06 (2013.01); B41N 2207/02 (2013.01); B41N 2207/10 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49563 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0511543 A1 19921104; EP 0511543 B1 19960313; EP 0511543 B2 20011219; DE 4113903 A1 19921029; JP H05154997 A 19930622; RU 2039664 C1 19950720; US 5188030 A 19930223

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2005-06-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-05-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030505

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-04-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-02-08 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2002-01-09 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-12-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1996-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 19961029

1996-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59205638 19960418

1996-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960314

1996-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1996-03-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1995-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER-ALBERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1994-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940617

1992-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19921029

1992-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE