Global patent index - EP 0511593 B2

EP 0511593 B2 2000-04-05 - Panoramic protection mask for operating interventions in polluted environments

Title (en)

Panoramic protection mask for operating interventions in polluted environments

Title (de)

Vollsichtschutzmaske für Intervenienzarbeiten in verschmutzten Umgebungen

Title (fr)

Masque panoramique de protection pour interventions opérationelles en milieux contaminés

Publication

EP 0511593 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 92106984 A

Priority

IT MI911171 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0511593A1] The described protection mask (1) comprises an annular lip (2) supporting a transparent screen (4) of toroidal form extending from the forehead of a user (3) to his chin. The screen (4) close to the user's mouth exhibits a preferably projecting middle portion (4c) having a connecting sleeve (5) provided with an inspiration opening (5b) and an expiration opening (5a) with which a single-acting valve (8) is associated, sealingly fastened thereto. A half-mask (6) is engaged to the inner part of the mask (1) and it sealingly acts by its perimetrical edge (6a) around the user's nose and mouth to bring them directly into communication with the expiration opening (5a). Two check valves (7) are associated with the half-mask (6) and are designed to enable the air transfer from the mask (1) inside to the half-mask (6) inside. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/02 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Excerpt from Victor Pauchet's "L'Atlante D'Anatomia", European Standard Ref.No. EN 136 1989 E

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0511593 A1 19921104; EP 0511593 B1 19961016; EP 0511593 B2 20000405; DE 69214502 D1 19961121; IT 1248373 B 19950111; IT MI911171 A1 19921101; IT MI911171 D0 19910430

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100423

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-04-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-08-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KASCO S.R.L.

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-04-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

- Free Format Text: CORRECTIONS

1997-03-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

1997-01-17 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970117

1996-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69214502

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-11-21

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-10-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19961016

1996-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DISPOSITIVI PROTEZIONE INDIVIDUALE - D.P.I. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950302

1994-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DISPOSITIVI PROTEZIONE INDIVIDUALE - D.P.I. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1993-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19930422

1992-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB