Global patent index - EP 0512254 B2

EP 0512254 B2 2000-01-19 - Process for uniform thermochemical treatment of steel pieces having difficult accessible areas

Title (en)

Process for uniform thermochemical treatment of steel pieces having difficult accessible areas

Title (de)

Verfahren zur gleichmässigen thermochemischen Behandlung von Bauteilen aus Stahl, die schwer zugängliche Flächen aufweisen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le traitement thermochimique uniforme de pièces en acier ayant des surfaces d'accès difficle

Publication

EP 0512254 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92105758 A

Priority

DE 4115135 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ288263B6] Hollow bodies or holes in steel components are subjected to thermomechanical treatments above 450 deg.C with reactive gases, partic. ammonia with 5-95 vol.% N or a C-generating gas, pref. methane at 870-1000 deg.C, at gas pressures above 0.2 MPa. Pref. the treatment is carried out at constant pressure, between 0.2 MPa and 10 MPa, depending on furnace capability.

[origin: CZ288263B6] Carburization of steel structural parts having areas that are difficult accessible from outside, such as nozzle bodies is carried out by heat treatment in the presence of carbon-liberating gases at temperatures ranging from 870 to 1000 degC and pressures above 0.2 MPa.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/20 (2006.01); C23C 8/22 (2006.01); C23C 8/26 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/22 (2013.01); C23C 8/26 (2013.01); F02M 61/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4115135 C1 19920227; AT 139579 T 19960715; CS 9201375 A3 19921216; CZ 288263 B6 20010516; DE 59206595 D1 19960725; EP 0512254 A2 19921111; EP 0512254 A3 19930324; EP 0512254 B1 19960619; EP 0512254 B2 20000119; ES 2088515 T3 19960816; ES 2088515 T5 20000501; HU 209457 B 19940628; HU 913870 D0 19920228; HU T61056 A 19921130; JP 3258071 B2 20020218; JP H05132753 A 19930528; PL 291528 A1 19921116; RU 2052535 C1 19960120; TW 223128 B 19940501

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110403

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110403

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59206595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110403

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Free Format Text: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG#WILHELM-ROHN-STR. 35#63450 HANAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG#WILHELM-ROHN-STR. 35#63450 HANAU (DE)

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-05-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-04-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-04-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES GMBH TRANSFER- ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-03-15 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-01-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-01-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1999-11-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

1998-04-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980403

1997-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: DEGUSSA AG TRANSFER- ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

1997-10-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

1997-05-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IPSEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 19970318

1997-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19970430

1997-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970430

1997-03-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19970324

- Year of fee payment: 06

1996-12-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

1996-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

1996-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960806

1996-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2088515

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1996-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59206595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 19960725

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1996-07-10 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2088515

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1996-07-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-06-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-06-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Effective date: 19960619

1996-06-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960619

1996-06-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960619

1996-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 139579

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 19960715

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1995-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950202

1993-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1992-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920403

1992-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE