Global Patent Index - EP 0512549 B2

EP 0512549 B2 2002-09-25 - Printing press

Title (en)

Printing press

Title (de)

Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Presse à imprimer

Publication

EP 0512549 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 92107737 A

Priority

  • JP 10589891 A
  • JP 16956191 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0512549A1] The improved printing press comprises: a single plate cylinder that allows press plates for n colors to be disposed cylindrically at predetermined intervals; a platemaking unit that is disposed on the circumference of the plate cylinder for preparing a single press for one color or n platemaking units that are disposed on the circumference of the plate cylinder for individually preparing press plates for single colors; an ink supply assembly for the n colors, an impression cylinder whose diameter is one-nth of that of the plate cylinder, said impression cylinder having a single sheet of printing paper wrapped around it and delivering the printing paper after it has made n consecutive revolutions; and, optionally, either one or both of a rubber-covered blanket cylinder interposed between the plate cylinder and the impression cylinder and a dampening water supply assembly for supplying dampening water to the press plate or plates. In the first case where only one platemaking unit is used, the printing press is applicable to both direct and offset printing on whichever types of press plates (letterpress, intaglio or lithography) or irrespective of whether dampening water is used or not on lithographic plates. The press obviates the need for registration in multicolor printing and can be operated even by unskilled operators. In the second case where a plurality of platemaking units are used, the printing press enables all press plates of interest to be prepared simultaneously on the single plate cylinder even in the process of multicolor printing, thereby shortening the platemaking time and, hence, the overall process time including platemaking and printing operations. The press is not only sufficiently simple in construction to realize a compact and small-sized system but also very easy to operate, permitting printing to be done at comparatively high speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10; B41C 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41C 1/12 (2006.01); B41F 30/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 30/06 (2013.01); B41C 1/1075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0512549 A1 19921111; EP 0512549 B1 19950628; EP 0512549 B2 20020925; DE 69203148 D1 19950803; DE 69203148 T2 19951102; DE 69203148 T3 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050507

2004-05-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-04-25 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-09-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1996-05-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 19960326

1995-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69203148 19950803

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1994-09-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940729

1992-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920507

1992-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB