Global Patent Index - EP 0513339 B1

EP 0513339 B1 2001-05-09 - Plant with a process control computer

Title (en)

Plant with a process control computer

Title (de)

Eine Anlage mit einem Prozessleitrechner

Title (fr)

Installation avec un ordinateur de contrôle de procédé

Publication

EP 0513339 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 92902312 A

Priority

  • CH 18991 A
  • CH 102591 A
  • CH 9200014 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5517404A] PCT No. PCT/CH92/00014 Sec. 371 Date Nov. 20, 1992 Sec. 102(e) Date Nov. 20, 1992 PCT Filed Jan. 21, 1992 PCT Pub. No. WO92/13121 PCT Pub. Date Jun. 8, 1992.A spinning mill with a master process control computer for at least one group of machines, whereby each machine of the group is provided with its own machine control unit which controls the actuators of the machine (including any auxiliary aggregates allocated to the machine). At least one network is provided for bidirectional communication between the computer and each machine of the group. During the operation of the plant, master control instructions from the process control computer are supplied via the network to the machine control units. Each machine control unit forwards the control instructions to the actuators controlled by the machine control unit, whereby the control instructions, if required, are converted by the machine control unit into control signals which are suitable for the actuators.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/14 (2006.01); D01H 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/14 (2013.01); D01H 13/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 5517404 A 19960514; DE 59209902 D1 20010613; EP 0513339 A1 19921119; EP 0513339 B1 20010509; JP 3242915 B2 20011225; JP H05505430 A 19930812; WO 9213121 A1 19920806

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-21 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021228

2003-01-29 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLANT WITH A PROCESS CONTROL COMPUTER

2002-04-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-04-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: W. SCHLAFHORST & CO.

- Effective date: 20020205

2002-04-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20020207

2001-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-12-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59209902 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IT LI

2000-06-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLANT WITH A PROCESS CONTROL COMPUTER

1995-01-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19941123

1992-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920918

1992-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IT LI