Global patent index - EP 0514376 B1

EP 0514376 B1 2000-09-27 - COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESS FOR CORROSION INHIBITION OF FERROUS METALS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESS FOR CORROSION INHIBITION OF FERROUS METALS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORROSIONSHEMMUNG VON EISENMETALLEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDE D'INHIBITION DE LA CORROSION DE METAUX FERREUX

Publication

EP 0514376 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 90912512 A

Priority

  • US 9004378 W
  • US 47550590 A
  • US 47550690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9112354A1] Compositions comprising certain amino acids such as aspartic acid, when fully ionized at alkaline pH, function effectively as corrosion inhibitors for ferrous metals in the presence of an aqueous medium. This effect is enhanced with increased fluid velocity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 11/14; C23F 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 11/06 (2006.01); C23F 11/14 (2006.01); C23F 11/173 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 11/145 (2013.01); C23F 11/06 (2013.01); C23F 11/144 (2013.01); C23F 11/173 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9112354 A1 19910822; AT 196661 T 20001015; CA 2072881 A1 19910807; CA 2072881 C 19991221; DE 69033634 D1 20001102; DE 69033634 T2 20010503; DK 0514376 T3 20010205; EP 0514376 A1 19921125; EP 0514376 B1 20000927; ES 2152210 T3 20010201; JP 2823137 B2 19981111; JP H05500832 A 19930218; KR 950000908 B1 19950203

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100806

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100805

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100806

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20100807

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-08-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *SOLUTIA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20100806

2010-08-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20100805

2010-08-23 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2010-08-18 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20100806

2010-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152210

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LUNATI & MAZZONI S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69033634

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196661

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950221

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOLUTIA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950221

1994-10-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940829

1992-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE