Global patent index - EP 0514480 B1

EP 0514480 B1 2001-04-04 - HIGH STRENGTH, HIGH FRACTURE TOUGHNESS ALLOY

Title (en)

HIGH STRENGTH, HIGH FRACTURE TOUGHNESS ALLOY

Title (de)

LEGIERUNG MIT HOHER FESTIGKEIT UND HOHER BRUCHZÄHIGKEIT

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE DE HAUTE RESISTANCE ET DE HAUTE TENACITE A LA RUPTURE

Publication

EP 0514480 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91904760 A

Priority

  • US 47577390 A
  • US 9100779 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9112352A1] A high strength, high fracture toughness steel alloy consisting essentially of, in weight percent, about C 0.2-0.33, Mn 0.20 max., Si 0.1 max., P 0.008 max., S 0.004 max., Cr 2-4, Ni 10.5-15, Mo 0.75-1.75, Co 8-17, Ce effective amount-0.030, La effective amount-0.01, Fe balance, and an article made therefrom are disclosed. A small but effective amount of calcium can be present in this alloy in substitution for some or all of the cerium and lanthanum. The alloy is an age-hardenable martensitic steel alloy which provides a unique combination of tensile strength and fracture toughness. The alloy provides excellent mechanical properties when hardened by vaccum heat treatment with inert gas cooling and has a low ductile-to-brittle transition temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/52 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • EP 0390468 A1 19901003 - CARPENTER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]
  • R.W. Hertzberg, "Deformation and Fracture Mechanics of Engineering Materials", 2nd Ed., 1983, John Wiley and Sons, p.363-367,410,411.
  • P.E.Waudby, "Rare Earth additions to steel", International Metals Reviews, 1978, No.2, p.74,82,83,93,94.
  • W.G.Wilson and A. McLean, "Desulfurisation of Iron and Steel and Sulphide Shape Control", AIME 1980, p.1,2,28-30.
  • P.V.Ribou and C.Gatellier, "New products: what should be done in secondary steelmaking?", Ironmaking and Steelmaking, 1985,Vol.12, No.2, p.79-86.
  • Wilson et al., "Rare Earth Adiions in CC steel", Journal of Metals, Sept. 1985
  • W. WILSON, ET AL.,: "Rare Earth additions in Continuously Cast Steel.", JOURNAL OF METALS,, pages 36 - 41, XP022153708, DOI: doi:10.1016/j.msea.2007.02.032

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9112352 A1 19910822; AT 200309 T 20010415; CA 2073460 A1 19910807; CA 2073460 C 19991214; DE 69132572 D1 20010510; DE 69132572 T2 20010927; EP 0514480 A1 19921125; EP 0514480 A4 19930127; EP 0514480 B1 20010404; ES 2156854 T3 20010801; IL 97154 A 19960131; IL 97154 D0 19920525; JP 2683599 B2 19971203; JP H03243747 A 19911030; JP H05502477 A 19930428; JP H0689436 B2 19941109

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110205

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110206

2012-05-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120511

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110204

2011-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-03-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20110204

2011-02-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69132572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100301

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156854

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69132572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200309

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1994-09-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19940812

1994-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CRS HOLDINGS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1993-01-29 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1993-01-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19921204

1993-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1992-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19920731

1992-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE