Global Patent Index - EP 0514618 B2

EP 0514618 B2 2000-05-10 - Temporary storage

Title (en)

Temporary storage

Title (de)

Zwischenspeicher

Title (fr)

Stock provisoire

Publication

EP 0514618 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92100806 A

Priority

  • CH 139291 A
  • US 29208394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0514618A1] A temporary store for the storage of sheets (2) for a specific time has an acceptance and a transport cycle and comprises a feed system (7) and a transport system (8). In the acceptance cycle, the intermediate store waits until a first detector (52) detects the presence of a sheet (2) at an entrance (11) and initiates an acceptance operation in the feed system (7) via a control unit (6). The feed system (7) layers the sheets (2), fed by a conveying system (4), to form a stack (12) in the transport system which is blocked in the acceptance cycle. As soon as the acceptance cycle is concluded, the control unit (6) decides whether the transport system (8) is to guide the stack (12) into a cassette (9) or into a rejection tray (10), and switches on driving means of the transport system (8), the stack (12) being transported in the predetermined direction. The intermediate store subsequently returns to the acceptance cycle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/04; B65H 29/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 83/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/14 (2006.01); B65H 29/36 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 31/30 (2006.01); G07B 11/02 (2006.01); G07D 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/14 (2013.01); B65H 29/36 (2013.01); B65H 29/60 (2013.01); G07D 11/0006 (2013.01); G07D 11/0018 (2013.01); G07D 11/0027 (2013.01); G07D 11/009 (2013.01); G07F 7/04 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01); B65H 2404/2613 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0514618 A1 19921125; EP 0514618 B1 19970409; EP 0514618 B2 20000510; CA 2067703 A1 19921109; DE 59208307 D1 19970515; ES 2099173 T3 19970516; ES 2099173 T5 20000816; JP 3325043 B2 20020917; JP H05139628 A 19930608; MX 9201205 A 19921101; US 5711649 A 19980127

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060121

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060120

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-01-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060121

2006-01-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060120

2005-02-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-01-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-08-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020121

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-01-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-01-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010105

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-07-21 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-05-31 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-05-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-03-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 19971223

1997-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

1997-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19970613

1997-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1997-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2099173

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1997-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59208307

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-05-15

1997-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

1997-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-04-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970409

1994-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19940705

1993-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARS INCORPORATED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1993-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LANDIS & GYR BUSINESS SUPPORT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1993-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19921208

1992-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE