EP 0515164 A3 19931103 - CHARGER HAVING CHARGING BLADE, IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS HAVING SAME AND PROCESS CARTRIDGE HAVING SAME
Title (en)
CHARGER HAVING CHARGING BLADE, IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS HAVING SAME AND PROCESS CARTRIDGE HAVING SAME
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 14532391 A 19910520
- JP 20547491 A 19910722
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0515164A2] A charging device includes a charging blade contactable to a member to be charged; a voltage applying device for applying an oscillating voltage between the charging blade and the member to be charged; and an urging spring for urging the charging blade and the member to be charged toward and away from each other. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G03G 15/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G03G 15/0216 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 2892973 A 19590630 - STRAUGHAN VIRGIL E
- [Y] EP 0312230 A2 19890419 - CANON KK [JP]
- [XP] US 5095335 A 19920310 - WATANABE KAZUSHI [JP], et al
- [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 320 (P-413)(2043) 14 December 1985 & JP-A-60 147 756 ( TOSHIBA K.K. ) 3 August 1985
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 131 (P-1186)29 March 1991 & JP-A-03 013 973 ( NEC CORP ) 22 January 1991
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 292 (P-1230)24 July 1991 & JP-A-03 100 675 ( CANON INC ) 25 April 1991
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 92304561 A 19920520