Global Patent Index - EP 0518567 B1

EP 0518567 B1 2000-09-13 - Synthetic lubricant base stock formed from high content branched chain acid mixtures

Title (en)

Synthetic lubricant base stock formed from high content branched chain acid mixtures

Title (de)

Aus mit einem hohen Gehalt an verzweigtkettigen Säuremischungen hergestellte synthetische Grundschmieröle

Title (fr)

Base lubrifiante synthétique formée à partir de mélanges d'acides dont une grande partie à chaînes ramifiées

Publication

EP 0518567 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92305169 A

Priority

US 71219091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0518567A1] An improved synthetic ester lubricant base stock formed by reacting a neopentyl polyol with a mixture of aliphatic monocarboxylic acids is provided. The mixture of acids includes straight-chain acids having from 5 to 10 carbon atoms and an iso-acid having from 7 to 10 carbon atoms, preferably iso-nonanoic acid, wherein the iso-acid is present in about 60-90 weight percent of the acid charge. The base stock is mixed with a conventional ester lubricant additive package to form a lubricant having a viscosity at 210 DEG F. of at least 7.0 centistockes with the resulting lubricants having a decreased tendency to form deposits in high temperature chain oil applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 105/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/38 (2006.01); C10N 30/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/38 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2240/14 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0518567 A1 19921216; EP 0518567 B1 20000913; DE 69231433 D1 20001019; DE 69231433 T2 20010523; JP H0665587 A 19940308

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120606

2012-06-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20120604

2012-06-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69231433

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HATCO CORP.

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231433 20001019

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-09-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000913

1994-09-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940812

1993-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930616

1992-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL