Global Patent Index - EP 0518674 B1

EP 0518674 B1 2002-09-18 - Ink jet printer architecture and method

Title (en)

Ink jet printer architecture and method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker-Aufbau und zugehöriges Verfahren

Title (fr)

Ensemble avec imprimante à jet d'encre et procédé correspondant

Publication

EP 0518674 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92305382 A

Priority

US 71506391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0518674A1] A printer accurately controls the passage of print media (22) therethrough and maintains the print media taut as the print media passes through a printing zone (P) while the media is printed by an ink jet printer. The print media sheet is preferably carried by a rotating drum (40) in a first direction through the printing zone, with the drum being reversed to cause the exiting of the print media sheet from the printer. A pressure fixing or fusing apparatus (96) may be positioned to flatten ink spots on the print media as the print media exits from the printer. The pressure fixing or fusing mechanism is preferably used in the case of a hot-melt or phase-change ink jet printer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/223 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0518674 A1 19921216; EP 0518674 B1 20020918; DE 69232774 D1 20021024; DE 69232774 T2 20030130; JP H05229204 A 19930907

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050611

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030611

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69232774 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEROX CORPORATION

1995-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950227

1993-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930609

1992-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT