Global Patent Index - EP 0522295 B1

EP 0522295 B1 2000-08-30 - Management connecting device for mobile radio telephone

Title (en)

Management connecting device for mobile radio telephone

Title (de)

Verbindungsverwaltungsgerät für Mobil-Funktelefon

Title (fr)

Dispositif de gestion des connexions pour radio-téléphone mobile

Publication

EP 0522295 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92109647 A

Priority

  • JP 5789892 A
  • JP 13474391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0522295A2] A mobile radio telephone apparatus is for use in a mobile radio telephone apparatus, whose one [1] zone has mobile terminals and communications connecting devices in P:Q, as well as a management connecting device for controlling the locations of the mobile terminals. The mobile radio telephone apparatus comprises a controlling unit for having the management connecting device operate as a communications connecting device, if another mobile terminal generates a connecting request, when all Q of the communications connecting devices are assigned to mobile terminals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/26; H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 60/04 (2009.01); H04W 68/00 (2009.01); H04W 84/16 (2009.01); H04W 76/02 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 60/04 (2013.01); H04W 68/00 (2013.01); H04W 84/16 (2013.01); H04W 76/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0522295 A2 19930113; EP 0522295 A3 19940309; EP 0522295 B1 20000830; AU 1812792 A 19921210; AU 665540 B2 19960111; DE 69231392 D1 20001005; DE 69231392 T2 20010201; US 5802475 A 19980901; US 6035195 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030609

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2002-06-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020612

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020610

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-06-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69231392

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-05

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6H 04Q 7/26 A, 6H 04Q 7/38 B

1999-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6H 04Q 7/26 A, 6H 04Q 7/38 B

1997-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970124

1994-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940606

1994-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1993-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB