Global Patent Index - EP 0522893 B2

EP 0522893 B2 2001-03-21 - Cross-lapper

Title (en)

Cross-lapper

Title (de)

Vliesbandleger

Title (fr)

Etaleur-nappeur

Publication

EP 0522893 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 92401480 A

Priority

FR 9106635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0522893A2] A fibre web (4) is transported by belts (2, 5) passing round rollers (32 to 43, 60 to 69). Some of these rollers are carried by main carriages (10, 14) movable to and fro above an apron (8) which is displaced parallel to the axes of the rollers and which receives the web (4) in the form of a lap. Auxiliary carriages (16, 18) are provided for keeping the length of travel of the belts (2, 5) constant in spite of the to-and-fro movements of the main carriages (10, 14). Each main carriage (10, 14) is connected to an auxiliary carriage by coupling means (92, 96) which are less extendable than the belts (2, 5) and which are arranged so as to be made live under the action of the means (84, 88) for driving the carriages. The invention is used in the production of nonwovens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/46; D01G 25/00; D04H 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2006.01); D01G 25/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D01G 25/00 (2013.01); Y10S 493/937 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9221800 A1 19921210; AT 129028 T 19951015; DE 522893 T1 19930609; DE 69205351 D1 19951116; DE 69205351 T2 19960502; DE 69205351 T3 20011031; EP 0522893 A2 19930113; EP 0522893 A3 19930224; EP 0522893 B1 19951011; EP 0522893 B2 20010321; ES 2077995 T3 19951201; ES 2077995 T5 20010616; FR 2677046 A1 19921204; FR 2677046 B1 19950113; JP 3258321 B2 20020218; JP H06502698 A 19940324; US 5341543 A 19940830

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 129028 T

- Effective date: 20120529

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120530

2012-05-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69205351

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110610

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090530

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090530

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ASSELIN-THIBEAU S.P.A.S.

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080606

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070529

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070529

2006-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-06-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060517

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-03-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2001-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-03-21 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

1996-08-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AUTEFA MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH

- Effective date: 19960710

1995-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19951114

1995-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2077995 T3

1995-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69205351 19951116

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

1995-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 129028 T 19951015

1995-09-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1994-12-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19941020

1993-06-09 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1993-04-07 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1993-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

1993-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920603

1993-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT