Global Patent Index - EP 0526781 B1

EP 0526781 B1 2000-05-03 - Fume extraction device with window and drive with locking device

Title (en)

Fume extraction device with window and drive with locking device

Title (de)

Rauch- und Wärmeabzugsanlage mit Flügel und mit einem Antrieb mit einer Verriegelunseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'évacuation de fumée à battant à commande munie d'un dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0526781 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 92112191 A

Priority

DE 9109712 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0526781A1] An electrical drive for a pivot-hung wing 1 is described. The electric motor 2 has a motor rod 5 on the output side. The electric motor is mounted in an articulated manner on the fixed frame, and the motor rod 5 is connected in an articulated manner to the wing 1, in order to drive the wing 1 motively. In known drives of this type, the motor is mounted so as to project relatively far into the room in order to obtain a sufficient locking of the wing. Or the motors have to be made especially powerful or designed as 2 synchronous double motors. In contrast to this, the invention provides a locking device 3 which is actuated via an adjusting linkage 7 driven by the electric motor 2 which serves at the same time as a setting-out motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/616 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9109712 U1 19911010; AT 192540 T 20000515; EP 0526781 A1 19930210; EP 0526781 B1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120718

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120716

2012-08-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20120716

2012-07-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59209831

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-06-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59209831

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192540

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEZE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-01-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19941122

1993-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19921228

1993-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI