Global Patent Index - EP 0528103 B2

EP 0528103 B2 2000-06-28 - Electrohydraulic actuator

Title (en)

Electrohydraulic actuator

Title (de)

Elektrohydraulische Stelleinheit

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande électro-hydraulique

Publication

EP 0528103 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92104566 A

Priority

DE 4124140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0528103A1] An electrohydraulic actuator, in particular for controlling construction machines, is proposed which has a displaceable main piston (2) as well as electromagnetically operable control means (5, 6). Merely a single control means (3) is provided which is designed as a pilot valve and is essentially arranged in series with the main piston (2). At least one displacement/force transducer in the form of a spring (7) is in operative connection with the main piston (2) as well as with the piston (4) of the pilot valve (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/043; F15B 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/043 (2006.01); F15B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0435 (2013.01); F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/043 (2013.01); F15B 13/0433 (2013.01); F15B 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4124140 A1 19930121; DE 4124140 C2 19950413; EP 0528103 A1 19930224; EP 0528103 B1 19951011; EP 0528103 B2 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-03-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-10-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-10-25 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-09-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DATA SOLLECITO LETT. INC.:02/03/2001;DE DOMINICIS

2000-06-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-08-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GFT GESELLSCHAFT FUER HYDRAULIK-TECHNOLOGIE GBR

1999-08-25 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TOLKSDORF, DETLEF * PIDDE, GERD

1996-08-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19960628

1996-08-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 19960709

1996-08-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19960628

1996-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960116

1995-12-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TOLKSDORF, DETLEF

1995-12-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIDDE, GERD

1995-11-29 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: O&K ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG

1995-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59203972 19951116

1995-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1995-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1994-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940203

1993-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930204

1993-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE