EP 0530752 A1 19930310 - Coating method.
Title (en)
Coating method.
Title (de)
Beschichtungsverfahren.
Title (fr)
Méthode d'enduction.
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 24647691 A 19910902
Abstract (en)
In a coating method in which a coating solution supplied from a coating nozzle is applied to a belt-shaped flexible support which is run continuously while being supported on a backup roller; the support is heated to 35 DEG C to 45 DEG C and the surface potential of the support on the backup roller set to 0.5 to 2 kV before it is coated with the coating solution, whereby even in the case where the surface of the web is relatively low in the number of polar groups, a relatively high potential can be uniformly provided on the surface of the web, and the critical coating speed can be greatly increased. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B05D 1/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/26 (2006.01); B05D 3/02 (2006.01); B05D 3/14 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/04 (2006.01); C08J 7/04 (2006.01); G03C 1/74 (2006.01); G03G 5/05 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B05D 1/007 (2013.01); B05D 3/144 (2013.01); G03C 1/74 (2013.01); B05D 1/26 (2013.01); B05D 3/0218 (2013.01); B05D 2252/02 (2013.01); G03C 1/915 (2013.01); G03C 2001/7418 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] EP 0055983 A2 19820714 - POLAROID CORP [US]
- [Y] EP 0299492 A2 19890118 - FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]
- [A] EP 0386796 A2 19900912 - FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 530 (P-1134) 21 November 1990 & JP-A-02 223 945 ( FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD ) 6 September 1990
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 77 (E-120) 30 June 1979 & JP-A-54 054 020 ( FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD ) 27 April 1979
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 366 (C-390) 6 December 1986 & JP-A-61 161 177 ( FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD ) 21 July 1986
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE IE NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0530752 A1 19930310; EP 0530752 B1 19990113; DE 69228160 D1 19990225; DE 69228160 T2 19990520; JP 2835659 B2 19981214; JP H0561151 A 19930312
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 92114937 A 19920901; DE 69228160 T 19920901; JP 24647691 A 19910902