Global Patent Index - EP 0530908 B2

EP 0530908 B2 2003-06-04 - Process for the preparation of a bridged metallocene compound as well as a catalyst component and a process for the polymerization of olefins

Title (en)

Process for the preparation of a bridged metallocene compound as well as a catalyst component and a process for the polymerization of olefins

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer verbrückten Metallocenverbindung und einer Katalysatorkomponente sowie Verfahren für die Polymerisation von Olefinen

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'un composé métallocène ponté et d'un composant de catalyseur ainsi qu'un procédé de polymérisation des oléfines

Publication

EP 0530908 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 92202638 A

Priority

NL 9101502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0530908A1] The invention relates to a process for the preparation of a bridged metallocene compound in which: (I) a bridged double ligand, reacting with a proton acceptor, is converted into a bridged double anion (II) the double anion is converted into the bridged metallocene compound through reaction with a compound of a group 4b, 5b or 6b metal from the Periodic System of Elements. reaction (II) being carried out in a liquid dispersant which a) comprises one or more weak Lewis bases, the conjugated acid of which has a dissociation constant pKa for which the following holds: pKa </= -2.5, b) contains at most 1 mole equivalent, relevant to the metal compound, of strong Lewis base, the conjugated acid of which has a pKa that is higher than -2.5. The invention further relates to a catalyst component for the polymerization of olefins and a process for the polymerization of olefins and a polyolefin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 17/00; B01J 31/22; C08F 4/62; C08F 4/642; C08F 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/00 (2006.01); C07F 17/02 (2006.01); C08F 4/60 (2006.01); C08F 4/62 (2006.01); C08F 4/64 (2006.01); C08F 4/642 (2006.01); C08F 4/6592 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/02 (2013.01); C07F 17/00 (2013.01); C08F 10/00 (2013.01); C08F 4/65912 (2013.01); C08F 4/65927 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/65927

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0530908 A1 19930310; EP 0530908 B1 19990421; EP 0530908 B2 20030604; AT 179177 T 19990515; CA 2077613 A1 19930307; CA 2077613 C 19990907; CN 1049899 C 20000301; CN 1070650 A 19930407; CN 1128272 A 19960807; DE 69228967 D1 19990527; DE 69228967 T2 19991216; DE 69228967 T3 20040722; ES 2131058 T3 19990716; ES 2131058 T5 20040401; JP 3249192 B2 20020121; JP H05239083 A 19930917; MX 9205050 A 19930301; NL 9101502 A 19930401; RU 2095364 C1 19971110; US 5646083 A 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111223

2011-01-14 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 04/21 - 3.2.

2011-01-14 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 04/24 - 3.2.

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DSM N.V.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060902

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SAUDI BASIC INDUSTRIES CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-05-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-07 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2004-04-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2003-11-21 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-11-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

2001-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BASELL POLYPROPYLEN GMBH

2001-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

2001-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BASELL POLYPROPYLEN GMBH

2001-08-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V. * 20000121 BASELL POLYPROPYLEN GMB

- Effective date: 20000113

2001-08-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V. * 20000121 BASELL POLYPROPYLEN GMB

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

2000-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TARGOR GMBH C/O BASF AG

2000-03-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-03-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TARGOR GMBH C/O BASF AG

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-03-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20000113

1999-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1999-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1999-07-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19990721

1999-07-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19990721

1999-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2131058 T3

1999-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69228967 19990527

1999-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-04-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 179177 T 19990515

1997-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970206

1993-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930721

1993-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE