Global Patent Index - EP 0531182 B2

EP 0531182 B2 2000-12-27 - Process and plant for distilling air and application in the feeding of gas to steel plants

Title (en)

Process and plant for distilling air and application in the feeding of gas to steel plants

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Luftdestillation und die Verwendung bei der Zuführung von Gas in Stahlwerken

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de distillation d'air, et application a l'alimentation en gaz d'une aciérie

Publication

EP 0531182 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 92402246 A

Priority

FR 9110035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2680114A1] The plant is of the type with a double column (2) and a mixing column (6). The latter is fed in the tank with auxiliary air compressed to a pressure differing from that of the intermediate-pressure column (3) and at the head with liquid drawn off at the bottom of the low-pressure column (4) and pumped at the same pressure as the auxiliary air. Impure oxygen is drawn off at the head of the mixing column as output gas, and nearly pure oxygen is produced in the tank of the low-pressure column. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04557 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04466 (2013.01); F25J 3/04678 (2013.01); F25J 2200/06 (2013.01); F25J 2200/90 (2013.01); F25J 2215/52 (2013.01); F25J 2235/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/40 (2013.01); F25J 2250/50 (2013.01); Y10S 62/915 (2013.01); Y10S 62/939 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2680114 A1 19930212; FR 2680114 B1 19940805; AU 2079892 A 19930211; AU 655485 B2 19941222; BR 9203049 A 19930504; CA 2075420 A1 19930208; CA 2075420 C 20030513; CN 1062656 C 20010228; CN 1071000 A 19930414; DE 69208412 D1 19960328; DE 69208412 T2 19960704; DE 69208412 T3 20010823; EP 0531182 A1 19930310; EP 0531182 B1 19960221; EP 0531182 B2 20001227; ES 2083709 T3 19960416; ES 2083709 T5 20010316; US 5291737 A 19940308

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090807

2011-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110729

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090806

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090807

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080811

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-04-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-08-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060807

2005-07-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-03-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-12-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

1997-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE BOC GROUP PLC

1997-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE BOC GROUP PLC

- Effective date: 19961119

1997-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19961121

1996-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2083709 T3

1996-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69208412 19960328

1996-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

1994-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940509

1993-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920814

1993-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE